Core v. LM General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kim Core
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company and LM General Insurance Company doing business as Liberty Mutual
Case Number: 1:2020cv02104
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robin L. Bowers on behalf of LM General Insurance CompanyAttorney Robin L. Bowers added to party LM General Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Bowers, Robin)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by LM General Insurance Company.(Spano, Brian)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 20 July 2020. Consent Form due by 9/22/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/29/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2104-NRN (angar, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Anton Sirchio on behalf of Kim CoreAttorney Joseph Anton Sirchio added to party Kim Core(pty:pla) (Sirchio, Joseph)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against LM General Insurance Company, filed by Kim Core.(jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Summons upon Liberty Mutual Insurance on 06/30/2020. (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance, filed by Kim Core.(jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant LM General Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 ROS on Liberty, #4 Discovery Protocol Order, #5 Delay Reduction Order, #6 Complaint, #7 Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Spano, Brian)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LM General Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 20cv32092. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7392751), filed by LM General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - ROS, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Notice of Filing, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Civil Case Cover, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spano, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Core v. LM General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Core
Represented By: Joseph Anton Sirchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company doing business as Liberty Mutual
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Represented By: Robin L. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?