Johnston v. Standard Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: WILLIAM J JOHNSTON and William J. Johnston
Defendant: Standard Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02106
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM regarding #21 MOTION to Bifurcate filed by Standard Fire Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/31/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 25, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Bifurcate by Defendant Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Jokerst, Amanda)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/13/2020. (cthom, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 19 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Scheduling Conference held on 8/13/2020. Discovery Deadline: April 30, 2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline: May 31, 2021. Initial Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: February 22, 2021. Rebuttal Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosures: March 22, 2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/19/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Jokerst, Amanda)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/4/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge Christine M. Arguello for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2106-CMA (angar, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02106-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 31 July 2020. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C. Colo.LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #13 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff William J. Johnston All parties do not consent.. (Sirchio, Joseph)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 27 July 2020. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference currently set on August 10, 2020 is vacated and rescheduled to August 13, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United StatesCourthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. All other aspects of this Courts July 21, 2020 order remain in effect. (cmadr, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Standard Fire Insurance Company.(Jokerst, Amanda)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 21 July 2020. Consent Form due by 7/31/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/3/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lori Kathryn Bell on behalf of Standard Fire Insurance CompanyAttorney Lori Kathryn Bell added to party Standard Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Bell, Lori)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Anton Sirchio on behalf of William J. JohnstonAttorney Joseph Anton Sirchio added to party William J. Johnston(pty:pla) (Sirchio, Joseph)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (cpomm, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons, Civil Complaint upon Standard Fire Insurance Company on 07/15/2020 (cpomm, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons, Civil Complaint upon Standard Fire Insurance Company on 6/10/2020. (cpomm, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Standard Fire Insurance Company, filed by William J. Johnston.(cpomm, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/20/2020) (cpomm, ).
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Standard Fire Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 20cv31882. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7392849), filed by Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Proposed Document Corporate Disclosure Statement, #15 Proposed Document Notice of Filing State Court Docket, #16 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Filing State Court Docket)(Jokerst, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnston v. Standard Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Amanda Catherine Jokerst
Represented By: Lori Kathryn Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM J JOHNSTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Johnston
Represented By: Joseph Anton Sirchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?