First Baptist Church of Boulder, The v. Church Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: The First Baptist Church of Boulder d/b/a The Pine Street Church and First Baptist Church of Boulder, The doing business as Pine Street Church, The
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02107
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Church Mutual Insurance Company.(Barbe, Anthony)
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Terence M. Ridley on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Terence M. Ridley added to party Church Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Ridley, Terence)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Church Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(Barbe, Anthony)
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #11 Notice of Entry of Appearance, #12 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Robert D. Green and Hunter M. Klein. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request (Suite 1900, Zip Code 77002) through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Robert Dale Green on behalf of First Baptist Church of Boulder, TheAttorney Robert Dale Green added to party First Baptist Church of Boulder, The(pty:pla) (Green, Robert)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Hunter Milam Klein on behalf of First Baptist Church of Boulder, TheAttorney Hunter Milam Klein added to party First Baptist Church of Boulder, The(pty:pla) (Klein, Hunter)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Church Mutual Insurance Company may have up to and including August 7, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Scheduling Conference is set for 9/28/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their Consent/Non-Consent Form and the Proposed Scheduling Order on or before 9/21/2020. An editable copy of the proposed order should also be emailed to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/21/2020. Text Only Entry(skclc1)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02107-SKC. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 21 July 2020. It is hereby ORDERED that I recuse myself from this case. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall cause this case to be reassigned to another judge. (cmadr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jsalz, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 ORIGINAL COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Church Mutual Insurance Company, filed by First Baptist Church of Boulder, The.(jsalz, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter - Brown to Nickel, #2 Exhibit B - Email Delivery Failure, #3 Exhibit C - Colorado Report)(Barbe, Anthony)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Church Mutual Holding Company, Inc. for Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Barbe, Anthony)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Church Mutual Insurance Company from District Court of Boulder County, Colorado, Case Number 2020CV30498. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7392879), filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Colorado Secretary of State Summary, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of L. Renlund, #4 Exhibit D - Suncoast Claims Letter and Estimate, #5 State Court - Complaint and Jury Demand 6-16-20, #6 State Court - Summons 6-16-20, #7 State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet 6-16-20, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barbe, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Baptist Church of Boulder, The v. Church Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The First Baptist Church of Boulder d/b/a The Pine Street Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Baptist Church of Boulder, The doing business as Pine Street Church, The
Represented By: Robert D. Green
Represented By: Hunter M. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony Carl Barbe
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?