USA v. Brannan
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: John Brannan
Case Number: 1:2020cv02134
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
2 Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/18/2020. (jgonz, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Protective Order by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/18/2020. Text Only Entry(jgonz, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant and filed by USA. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/18/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 17, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant and by Plaintiff USA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) stipulated protective order)(Wang, Andrea)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant and by Plaintiff USA. (Wang, Andrea)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Scheduling Conference with Magistrate Judge Nina Wang is VACATED and re-set for 9/21/2020 10:30 AM (same time/date), but now to take place in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before newly assigned Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Parties shall appear telephonically by calling 888-363-4749, Access Code 3136546# at the time of the hearing. Proposed Order due by 9/14/20. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 11, 2020. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This matter has its factual nexus in Moffat County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. As approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 20-cv-02134-RM-GPG. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on September 10, 2020. (rvill, )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/9/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/9/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #7 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02134-RM. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff USA All parties do not consent.. (Wang, Andrea)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint Attorney Mark Rodman Davis added to party John Brannan(pty:dft) by John Brannan.(Davis, Mark)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. John Brannan waiver sent on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Wang, Andrea)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/21/20, Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 9/7/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/14/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Brannan Attorney Andrea Wang added to party United States of America(pty:pla), filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Wang, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Brannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brannan
Represented By: Mark Rodman Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Andrea Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?