Zavala Licensing LLC v. VIAVI Solutions Inc.
Plaintiff: Zavala Licensing LLC
Defendant: VIAVI Solutions Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02199
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant VIAVI Solutions Inc.. (Sayres, Joel)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order no later than October 21, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/15/2020. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM regarding #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Zavala Licensing LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/15/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Zavala Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rabicoff, Isaac)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time Respond to Complaint. VIAVI Solutions Inc. answer due 9/23/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/2/2020. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
September 1, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by VIAVI Solutions Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/1/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant VIAVI Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Sayres, Joel)
August 13, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant VIAVI Solutions Inc.. VIAVI Solutions Inc. answer due 9/9/2020. (Sayres, Joel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Erling Grimsrud on behalf of VIAVI Solutions Inc.Attorney Timothy Erling Grimsrud added to party VIAVI Solutions Inc.(pty:dft) (Grimsrud, Timothy)
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brianna Lynn Silverstein on behalf of VIAVI Solutions Inc.Attorney Brianna Lynn Silverstein added to party VIAVI Solutions Inc.(pty:dft) (Silverstein, Brianna)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lucas J. Tomsich on behalf of VIAVI Solutions Inc.Attorney Lucas J. Tomsich added to party VIAVI Solutions Inc.(pty:dft) (Tomsich, Lucas)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joel David Sayres on behalf of VIAVI Solutions Inc.Attorney Joel David Sayres added to party VIAVI Solutions Inc.(pty:dft) (Sayres, Joel)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/29/2020. (ksena)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/28/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, ) Modified on 7/28/2020 to add seal to summons (alave, ).
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (alave, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of Zavala Licensing LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Patent Infringement against VIAVI Solutions Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7405960)Attorney Isaac Philip Rabicoff added to party Zavala Licensing LLC(pty:pla), filed by Zavala Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zavala Licensing LLC v. VIAVI Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zavala Licensing LLC
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAVI Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Joel David Sayres
Represented By: Timothy Erling Grimsrud
Represented By: Lucas J. Tomsich
Represented By: Brianna Lynn Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?