Holy Cross Evangelical Lutheran Church of Wheat Ridge, Colorado v. Church Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Holy Cross Evangelical Lutheran Church of Wheat Ridge, Colorado
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02222
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Church Mutuals Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs First, Fourth & Fifth Claims For Relief In The Complaint [ECF No. 3] Church Mutuals Reply In Support Of Motion To Dismiss [MOT., ECF NO. 11; RESP., ECF NO. 15] filed by Defendant Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Barbe, Anthony)
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Church Mutuals Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs First, Fourth & Fifth Claims For Relief In The Complaint [ECF No. 3] filed by Plaintiff Holy Cross Evangelical Lutheran Church of Wheat Ridge, Colorado. (Norton, Dallas)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Dallas Daniel Norton on behalf of Holy Cross Evangelical Lutheran Church of Wheat Ridge, ColoradoAttorney Dallas Daniel Norton added to party Holy Cross Evangelical Lutheran Church of Wheat Ridge, Colorado(pty:pla) (Norton, Dallas)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Barbe, Anthony)
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Church Mutual Insurance Company.(Barbe, Anthony)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Church Mutuals Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs First, Fourth & Fifth Claims For Relief In The Complaint [ECF No. 3] by Defendant Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Policy)(Barbe, Anthony)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Terence M. Ridley on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Terence M. Ridley added to party Church Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Ridley, Terence)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Church Mutual Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(Barbe, Anthony)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Church Mutual Insurance Company. Church Mutual Insurance Company answer due 8/18/2020. (Barbe, Anthony)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/14/2020 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 9/30/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/7/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/28/2020. (jgonz, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Church Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Holy Cross Evangelical Lutheran Church of Wheat Ridge, Colorado.(jtorr, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Church Mutual Holding Company, Inc. for Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Barbe, Anthony)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Church Mutual Insurance Company from District Court, Boulder County, Colorado, Case Number 2020CV030393. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7407643), filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Colorado Secretary of State - Summary, #2 Exhibit B - Colorado Secretary of State - Summary, #3 Exhibit C - Norton Letter, #4 Exhibit D - CEC Estimate, #5 Exhibit E - Arepa Estimate, #6 Exhibit F - CIS Estimate, #7 State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet 5-6-20, #8 State Court - Complaint 5-6-20, #9 State Court - Delay Prevention Order 7-6-20, #10 State Court - Wavier of Service 7-9-20, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barbe, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holy Cross Evangelical Lutheran Church of Wheat Ridge, Colorado v. Church Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holy Cross Evangelical Lutheran Church of Wheat Ridge, Colorado
Represented By: Dallas Daniel Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony Carl Barbe
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?