Motto Franchising, LLC v. Navarra et al
Plaintiff: Motto Franchising, LLC
Defendant: Motto Mortgage Advanced and Marc C Navarra
Case Number: 1:2020cv02242
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gabrielle Lyn Robbie on behalf of Motto Franchising, LLCAttorney Gabrielle Lyn Robbie added to party Motto Franchising, LLC(pty:pla) (Robbie, Gabrielle)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/22/2020 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 10/8/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/15/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/30/2020. (jgonz, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Motto Mortgage Advanced, Marc C Navarra (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7410559)Attorney Jacqueline Ventre Roeder added to party Motto Franchising, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Motto Franchising, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit A - part 2 of 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Marc C. Navarra, #5 Summons Motto Mortgage Advanced)(Roeder, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motto Franchising, LLC v. Navarra et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motto Mortgage Advanced
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc C Navarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motto Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Ventre Roeder
Represented By: Gabrielle Lyn Robbie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?