6 West Apartments, LLC v. Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: 6 West Apartments, LLC
Defendant: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company and Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02243
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/28/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/28/2021. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/24/20. (Attachments: #1 redlined version) (jdyne, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: I wish to inform the parties that my daughter, who is not a lawyer, works in a clerical position with the law firm of Holland & Hart which represents plaintiff in this case. The position is not in the litigation department, and I do not believe her employment would cause any bias or prejudice for or against parties represented by that law firm. Nevertheless, I will respect and honor a request by any party who wishes that I recuse from further participation in this case. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/21/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff 6 West Apartments, LLC. (Ramirez, Jose)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Ohio Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Ludwig, Jon)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jon M. Ludwig on behalf of Ohio Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Jon M. Ludwig added to party Ohio Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Ludwig, Jon)
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly C. White on behalf of Ohio Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Holly C. White added to party Ohio Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (White, Holly)
August 12, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Ramirez, Jose)
August 4, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Ohio Casualty Insurance Company.(Spano, Brian)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shawn A. Eady on behalf of 6 West Apartments, LLCAttorney Shawn A. Eady added to party 6 West Apartments, LLC(pty:pla) (Eady, Shawn)
July 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jose Antonio Ramirez on behalf of 6 West Apartments, LLCAttorney Jose Antonio Ramirez added to party 6 West Apartments, LLC(pty:pla) (Ramirez, Jose)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Due to the COVID-19 pandemic the Court will not hold a Scheduling Conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate. The proposed scheduling order should be prepared as described in the local rules. A copy of instructions for the preparation of a scheduling order and a form scheduling order can be downloaded from the Courts website www.cod.uscourts.gov/CourtOperations/RulesProcedures/Forms.aspx. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/30/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summon, Complaint and Jury Demand, Delay Reduction Order, Civil Cover Sheet upon Ohio Casualty Insurance Company on 07/01/2020. (jtorr, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, filed by 6 West Apartments, LLC.(jtorr, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of FILING OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Complaint with Jury Demand, #5 Delay Reduction Order, #6 ROS on Ohio Casualty)(Spano, Brian)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 20cv32079. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7411101), filed by The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - ROS on Ohio Casualty, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spano, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 6 West Apartments, LLC v. Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 6 West Apartments, LLC
Represented By: Shawn A. Eady
Represented By: Jose Antonio Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Represented By: Jon M. Ludwig
Represented By: Holly C. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?