Zhao v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jingmin Zhao
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02279
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 18 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Scheduling Conference terminated pursuant to Minute Order 17 . Text Only Entry (morti, )
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER In light of 12 Case Reassignment, the Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2020 10:15 AM is VACATED to be reset if this matter is referred to this Court. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/25/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Maul, Jami)
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason Glenn Alleman on behalf of Jingmin ZhaoAttorney Jason Glenn Alleman added to party Jingmin Zhao(pty:pla) (Alleman, Jason)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cameron Oren Hunter on behalf of Jingmin ZhaoAttorney Cameron Oren Hunter added to party Jingmin Zhao(pty:pla) (Hunter, Cameron)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Chad Patrick Hemmat on behalf of Jingmin ZhaoAttorney Chad Patrick Hemmat added to party Jingmin Zhao(pty:pla) (Hemmat, Chad)
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #11 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02279-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Maul, Jami)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Submission of State Court Docket Sheet and Delay Reduction Order & Order Regarding Plan for Settlement by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit D -Delay Reduction Order & Order Regarding Plan for Settlement)(Maul, Jami)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Wheeler, Karen)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/1/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 9/17/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/24/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/4/2020. (jgonz, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 07/13/2020. (alave, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Jingmin Zhao.(alave, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Maul, Jami)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2020CV31348. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7417847), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit B - Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - Return of Service, #6 Exhibit E - Restated Articles of Association, #7 Exhibit F - Certificate of Good Standing)(Wheeler, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhao v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Jami Allison Maul
Represented By: Karen Hannah Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jingmin Zhao
Represented By: Cameron Oren Hunter
Represented By: Chad Patrick Hemmat
Represented By: Jason Glenn Alleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?