Fountain Side Homeowners Association, Inc v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Fountain Side Homeowners Association, Inc
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv02280
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02280-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America All parties do not consent.. (Koehler, Jonathan)
September 9, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., for Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America. (Koehler, Jonathan)
September 8, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America.(Koehler, Jonathan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America.. (Koehler, Jonathan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Thomas Koehler on behalf of Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Jonathan Thomas Koehler added to party Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Koehler, Jonathan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy M. Samberg on behalf of Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Amy M. Samberg added to party Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Samberg, Amy)
August 18, 2020 Filing 10 Administrative Notice: Duplicate document filing re #8 & #9 . No action required. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fountain Side Homeowners Association, Inc. (Daly, Richard)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fountain Side Homeowners Association, Inc. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Daly, Richard)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Julian Archer on behalf of Fountain Side Homeowners Association, IncAttorney Thomas Julian Archer added to party Fountain Side Homeowners Association, Inc(pty:pla) (Archer, Thomas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of Fountain Side Homeowners Association, IncAttorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Fountain Side Homeowners Association, Inc(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 4 August 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before October 6, 2020, the partiesshall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form. Proposed Scheduling Order due10/13/2020 Scheduling Conference set for 10/20/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:Sean B Leventhal.The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7416907)Attorney Richard D. Daly added to party Fountain Side Homeowners Association, Inc(pty:pla), filed by Fountain Side Homeowners Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daly, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fountain Side Homeowners Association, Inc v. Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fountain Side Homeowners Association, Inc
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Represented By: Jonathan Shawn Sar
Represented By: Thomas Julian Archer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?