Miller v. Executive Director of CDOC et al
Plaintiff: Marc J. Miller
Defendant: Warden of Sterling Correctional Facility and Executive Director of CDOC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02321
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT against Executive Director of CDOC, Warden of Sterling Correctional Facility, filed by Marc J. Miller.(sphil, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 PAYMENT RECEIVED from Marc J. Miller in the amount of $ 18.50; Receipt Number cox096505; Monthly Payment. (sphil, )
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File a Second Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file a Second Amended Complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Plaintiff, with a copy of this Order, one blank Prisoner Complaint form and the applicable instructions, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/17/2020. (forms mailed as ordered). (sphil, )
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/16/2020, re: #7 the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 is GRANTED. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to DOC_inmateaccounts@state.co.us. (sphil, ) (order emailed to DOC as instructed).
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Plaintiff Marc J. Miller.(sphil, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Executive Director of CDOC, Warden of Sterling Correctional Facility, filed by Marc J. Miller.(sphil, )
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Plaintiff with a copy of this Order one blank copy of the current Court-approved form Prisoners Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. ORDERED that the motion at ECF No. 4 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as on the incorrect form, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/31/2020. (forms mailed as ordered) (sphil, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Plaintiff Marc J. Miller. (sphil, ) Modified on 9/1/2020 to edit text. (sphil, ).
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/6/2020. (sphil, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Executive Director of CDOC, Warden of Sterling Correctional Facility, filed by Marc J. Miller.(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Executive Director of CDOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden of Sterling Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Director of CDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?