Box Elder Kids, LLC et al v. Occidental Petroleum Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Box Elder Kids, LLC, C C Open A, LLC and Guest Family Trust
Defendant: Oxy USA, Inc, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Anadarko E & P Onshore, LLC, Anadarko Land Corporation, Occidental Petroleum Corporation and Kerr-McGee Oil and Gas Onshore, LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv02352
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Anadarko E & P Onshore, LLC, Anadarko Land Corporation, Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Kerr-McGee Oil and Gas Onshore, LP, Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Oxy USA, Inc, filed by Guest Family Trust, C C Open A, LLC, Box Elder Kids, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Shaklee Surface Owner's Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 Constance Guest Surface Owner's Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 Union Pacific Surface Owner's Agreement)(Frankland, Barbara)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Continue. For good cause, the Scheduling Conference is RESET for 11/16/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The proposed order is due on or before 11/9/2020. The parties should plan on using the same dial-in instructions previously provided unless otherwise notified. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/17/2020. Text Only Entry(skclc1)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM regarding #22 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines to Permit Amendment of Complaint filed by Guest Family Trust, Box Elder Kids, LLC, C C Open A, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/17/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines to Permit Amendment of Complaint by Plaintiffs Box Elder Kids, LLC, C C Open A, LLC, Guest Family Trust. (Frankland, Barbara)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Larkin Evans Walsh on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Larkin Evans Walsh added to party Box Elder Kids, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Larkin Evans Walsh added to party C C Open A, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Larkin Evans Walsh added to party Guest Family Trust(pty:pla) (Walsh, Larkin)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shannon Nicole Smith on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Shannon Nicole Smith added to party Anadarko E & P Onshore, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Nicole Smith added to party Anadarko Land Corporation (pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Nicole Smith added to party Anadarko Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Nicole Smith added to party Kerr-McGee Oil and Gas Onshore, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Nicole Smith added to party Occidental Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Nicole Smith added to party Oxy USA, Inc(pty:dft) (Smith, Shannon)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anthony N. Kaim on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Anthony N. Kaim added to party Anadarko E & P Onshore, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony N. Kaim added to party Anadarko Land Corporation (pty:dft), Attorney Anthony N. Kaim added to party Anadarko Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony N. Kaim added to party Kerr-McGee Oil and Gas Onshore, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony N. Kaim added to party Occidental Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony N. Kaim added to party Oxy USA, Inc(pty:dft) (Kaim, Anthony)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Barrett H. Reasoner on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Barrett H. Reasoner added to party Anadarko E & P Onshore, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Barrett H. Reasoner added to party Anadarko Land Corporation (pty:dft), Attorney Barrett H. Reasoner added to party Anadarko Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Barrett H. Reasoner added to party Kerr-McGee Oil and Gas Onshore, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Barrett H. Reasoner added to party Occidental Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Barrett H. Reasoner added to party Oxy USA, Inc(pty:dft) (Reasoner, Barrett)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Spencer R Allen on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Spencer R Allen added to party Anadarko E & P Onshore, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Spencer R Allen added to party Anadarko Land Corporation (pty:dft), Attorney Spencer R Allen added to party Anadarko Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Spencer R Allen added to party Kerr-McGee Oil and Gas Onshore, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Spencer R Allen added to party Occidental Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Spencer R Allen added to party Oxy USA, Inc(pty:dft) (Allen, Spencer)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carlos R. Romo on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Carlos R. Romo added to party Anadarko E & P Onshore, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos R. Romo added to party Anadarko Land Corporation (pty:dft), Attorney Carlos R. Romo added to party Anadarko Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos R. Romo added to party Kerr-McGee Oil and Gas Onshore, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos R. Romo added to party Occidental Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos R. Romo added to party Oxy USA, Inc(pty:dft) (Romo, Carlos)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, Anadarko Land Corporation, Occidental Petroleum Corporation, Anadarko E & P Onshore, LLC, Kerr-McGee Oil and Gas Onshore, LP, Oxy USA, Inc. All Defendants. (Williams, Ezekiel)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 9/25/2020. At the scheduled time, Counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 8/19/2020. Text Only Entry (amont, )
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Oxy USA, Inc served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Sharp, Rex)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Occidental Petroleum Corporation served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Sharp, Rex)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Kerr-McGee Oil and Gas Onshore, LP served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Sharp, Rex)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Anadarko Petroleum Corporation served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Sharp, Rex)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Anadarko Land Corporation served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Sharp, Rex)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Anadarko E & P Onshore, LLC served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Sharp, Rex)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (evana, )
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to 1. Anadarko E & P Onshore, LLC 2. Anadarko Land Corporation 3. Anadarko Petroleum Corporation 4. Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LP 5. Occidental Petroleum Corporation 6. OXY USA, Inc. by Plaintiffs Box Elder Kids, LLC, C C Open A, LLC, Guest Family Trust. (Attachments: #1 Summons Anadarko Land Corporation, #2 Summons Anadarko Petroleum Corporation, #3 Summons Kerr-McGee Oil & Gas Onshore, LP, #4 Summons Occidental Petroleum Corporation, #5 Summons OXY USA, Inc.)(Sharp, Rex)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge Crews is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/10/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. Summons submitted has incorrect caption and not issued. All defendants must be listed in the summons caption. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (jtorr, )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Rex A. Sharp. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7425825)Attorney Rex A. Sharp added to party Box Elder Kids, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Rex A. Sharp added to party C C Open A, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Rex A. Sharp added to party Guest Family Trust(pty:pla), filed by Guest Family Trust, C C Open A, LLC, Box Elder Kids, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Shaklee SOA (redacted), #2 Exhibit 2- Guest SOA, #3 Summons Anadarko E&P, #4 Summons Anadarko Land, #5 Summons Anadarko Petroleum, #6 Summons Kerr McGee, #7 Summons Occidental Petroleum, #8 Summons Oxy)(Sharp, Rex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Box Elder Kids, LLC et al v. Occidental Petroleum Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxy USA, Inc
Represented By: Barrett H. Reasoner
Represented By: Carlos R. Romo
Represented By: Spencer R Allen
Represented By: Shannon Nicole Smith
Represented By: Ezekiel J. Williams
Represented By: Anthony N. Kaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Barrett H. Reasoner
Represented By: Carlos R. Romo
Represented By: Spencer R Allen
Represented By: Shannon Nicole Smith
Represented By: Ezekiel J. Williams
Represented By: Anthony N. Kaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko E & P Onshore, LLC
Represented By: Barrett H. Reasoner
Represented By: Carlos R. Romo
Represented By: Spencer R Allen
Represented By: Shannon Nicole Smith
Represented By: Ezekiel J. Williams
Represented By: Anthony N. Kaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anadarko Land Corporation
Represented By: Barrett H. Reasoner
Represented By: Carlos R. Romo
Represented By: Spencer R Allen
Represented By: Shannon Nicole Smith
Represented By: Ezekiel J. Williams
Represented By: Anthony N. Kaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Barrett H. Reasoner
Represented By: Carlos R. Romo
Represented By: Spencer R Allen
Represented By: Shannon Nicole Smith
Represented By: Ezekiel J. Williams
Represented By: Anthony N. Kaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerr-McGee Oil and Gas Onshore, LP
Represented By: Barrett H. Reasoner
Represented By: Carlos R. Romo
Represented By: Spencer R Allen
Represented By: Shannon Nicole Smith
Represented By: Ezekiel J. Williams
Represented By: Anthony N. Kaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Box Elder Kids, LLC
Represented By: Lance F. Astrella
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Larkin Evans Walsh
Represented By: Barbara C. Frankland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C C Open A, LLC
Represented By: Lance F. Astrella
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Larkin Evans Walsh
Represented By: Barbara C. Frankland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guest Family Trust
Represented By: Lance F. Astrella
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: Larkin Evans Walsh
Represented By: Barbara C. Frankland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?