Ulery v. AT&T Mobility Services, LLC
Plaintiff: DAVID ULERY
Defendant: AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02354
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 38 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #37 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed in this case on 5/27/2021. Text Only Entry (angar, )
May 27, 2021 Filing 37 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Plaintiff David Ulery. (Richards, Jordan)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the #35 Joint Notice of Settlement, the deadline to file dismissal documents is extended to June 1, 2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/03/21. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2)
May 3, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Settlement JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Plaintiff David Ulery (Richards, Jordan)
April 27, 2021 Filing 34 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Joshua H. Eggnatz was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the #32 Joint Status Report, this case remains STAYED. On or before May 3, 2021, the parties shall file appropriate dismissal documents and/or another joint status report advising the court as to the status of this matter. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 04/12/21. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2)
April 12, 2021 Filing 32 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Steinmetz, Kyle)
December 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12 December 2020. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that "Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Pending the Supreme Court's Decision in Facebook v. Duguid" (Doc. No. #29 ) is GRANTED. Discovery in this matter is STAYED pending the United States Supreme Court's ruling in Facebook, Inc. v. Duguid, No. 19-511 (U.S. July 9, 2020). The parties shall file a joint status report within ten days of the United States Supreme Court's ruling in Facebook, to advise whether the Scheduling Order should be amended.(cmadr, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM regarding #29 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending The Supreme Court's Decision in Facebook v. Duguid filed by AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/4/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Pending The Supreme Court's Decision in Facebook v. Duguid by Defendant AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Steinmetz, Kyle)
November 20, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against AT&T Mobility Services, LLC, filed by David Ulery.(Eggnatz, Joshua)
November 20, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiff David Ulery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Eggnatz, Joshua)
November 20, 2020 Filing 26 DISREGARD - Re filed at #28 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against AT&T Mobility Services, LLC, filed by David Ulery.(Eggnatz, Joshua) Modified on 11/20/2020 to show re filed at #28 (angar, ).
November 5, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss and Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6) or in the Alternative to Stay by Defendant AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Steinmetz, Kyle)
October 22, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle J. Steinmetz on behalf of AT&T Mobility Services, LLCAttorney Kyle J. Steinmetz added to party AT&T Mobility Services, LLC(pty:dft) (Steinmetz, Kyle)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 16 October 2020. Designation of Affirmative Experts due 2/19/2021. Discovery due by 4/19/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/19/2021. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due 3/19/2021. (cmadr, )
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 16 October 2020. A Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference is set for July 26, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The parties shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers at 719-575-0328 at the scheduled time. The court expects parties to utilize land line telephones rather than cellular devices whenever possible. If a party must utilize a cellular telephone, the caller must be in an indoor stationary position. A proposed Final Pretrial Order shall be prepared by the parties and filed with the court no later than July 19, 2021. Trial dates and trial preparation conferences will be set by the District Court under separate order. (cmadr, )
October 15, 2020 Filing 21 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant AT&T Mobility Services, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Smith, Douglas)
October 15, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Smith, Douglas)
October 14, 2020 Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Smith, Douglas)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Motion for a 30-Day Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint, on or before November 5, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/05/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
October 4, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM regarding #16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/4/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Defendant AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Order)(Smith, Douglas)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Local Rule 6.1(a) Stipulated 21-Day Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint and Unopposed Motion for an Additional 9-Day Extension. Defendant shall file an answer, or otherwise respond, to the #1 Complaint, no later than October 5, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/03/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, (Local Rule 6.1(a) Stipulated 21-Day Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint and Unopposed Motion for an Additional 9-Day Extension) filed by AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/3/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, (Local Rule 6.1(a) Stipulated 21-Day Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint and Unopposed Motion for an Additional 9-Day Extension) filed by AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/3/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, (Local Rule 6.1(a) Stipulated 21-Day Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint and Unopposed Motion for an Additional 9-Day Extension) by Defendant AT&T Mobility Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Smith, Douglas)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Ulery. AT&T Mobility Services, LLC served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. (Richards, Jordan)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/14/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/14/2020 (jgonz, )
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/ 13/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/13/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua H. Eggnatz on behalf of David UleryAttorney Joshua H. Eggnatz added to party David Ulery(pty:pla) (Eggnatz, Joshua)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND COURT: Joshua H. Eggnatz attempted to enter an appearance in this case by affixing his "s/" signature to the complaint. Counsel was removed from the attorney roll for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial fee. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a)(5), his purported appearance will not be recognized. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Additionally, counsel must file a notice of entry of appearance in this case upon being restored to the attorney roll. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number COX096014. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES, LLC (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Jordan Lee Richards added to party DAVID ULERY(pty:pla), filed by DAVID ULERY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES, LLC)(Richards, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ulery v. AT&T Mobility Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID ULERY
Represented By: Jordan Lee Richards
Represented By: Joshua H. Eggnatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Allen Smith
Represented By: Kyle J. Steinmetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?