Radtke v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Radtke
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02365
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 23 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 30 September 2020. For the reasons stated herein, this court respectfully RECOMMENDS that: (1) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #8 be DENIED. (cmadr, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiff Joseph Radtke. (Radtke, Joseph)
September 11, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court of #20 Minute Order, to Joseph Radtke, 11356 West Maplewood Avenue, Littleton, CO 80127. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/11/20 re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss [#8] on or before October 2, 2020; and a copy of this Minute Order shall be sent to: Joseph Radtke, 11356 West Maplewood Avenue, Littleton, CO 80127. (nmarb, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 19 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Status Conference held on 9/10/2020 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discussion regarding service of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.s Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss the Complaint #8 filed August 17, 2020. Defendant will resend the motion today. The court will set a deadline for Plaintiff to respond to the motion once the notice regarding service is filed. FTR: NYW-CRD. (bwilk, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Experian's Attempts to Serve Motion to Dismiss on Plaintiff by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Yi, Sean)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion for default judgment #15 , and being otherwise fully advised, the motion is DENIED because Defendant has timely filed a motion to dismiss. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/28/2020. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
August 28, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/28/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon review of this matter in which Plaintiff appears pro se. The Court strongly encourages Plaintiff to contact the Federal Pro Se Clinic which provides free assistance to people representing themselves in the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado. The Clinic cannot assist with criminal, bankruptcy, habeas, appeals, or any state cases. If Plaintiff wishes to avail himself of this service, he may make an appointment by phone (303-380-8786) or online at www.cobar.org/cofederalproseclinic. The Clinic is located at: Alfred A. Arraj Courthouse (first floor), 901 19th Street, Denver, CO 80294. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/28/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/28/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/28/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02365-RM. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Joseph Radtke. (cmadr, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Yi, Sean)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/20/20. Consent Form due by 8/27/2020. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/10/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Yi, Sean)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Yi, Sean)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Dong Yi on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Attorney Sean Dong Yi added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (pty:dft) (Yi, Sean)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Experian Information Solutions Inc on 07/21/2020. (jtorr, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Under Simplified Civil Procedure against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., filed by Joseph Radtke.(jtorr, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7427357), filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Summons, #2 Exhibit State Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Return of Service, #4 Docket Sheet State Docket Sheet, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Averbach, Robyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radtke v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Robyn Berger Averbach
Represented By: Sean Dong Yi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Radtke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?