Vogel v. Home Depot USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sera Swan Vogel
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc. d/b/a The Home Depot and Home Depot USA, Inc. doing business as Home Depot, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv02383
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 24 September 2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2020 02:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Unless otherwise notified by the Court, the Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as aparticipant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/24/2020. (ebuch)
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance on Behalf of Plaintiff by Brett Norman Huff on behalf of Sera Swan VogelAttorney Brett Norman Huff added to party Sera Swan Vogel(pty:pla) (Huff, Brett)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE re 3 Administrative Notice, of Filing Boulder County District Court Complaint by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc. (Vaughn, Katherine)
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott Douglas Knight on behalf of Home Depot USA, Inc.Attorney Scott Douglas Knight added to party Home Depot USA, Inc.(pty:dft) (Knight, Scott)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: No initiating document. The State Court Complaint must be filed with the initiating document for this civil action. Attorney contacted with instructions to file the initiating document within 24 hours. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) Modified to add text on 8/11/2020 (jtorr, ).
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Home Depot USA, Inc.(jtorr, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN of Service of District Court Civil Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Home Depot USA, Inc. on 07/10/2020. (jtorr, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Home Depot USA, Inc. d/b/a The Home Depot (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vaughn, Katherine)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Home Depot USA, Inc. d/b/a The Home Depot from District Court, Boulder County, Colorado, Case Number 2020CV30548. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7429465), filed by Home Depot USA, Inc. d/b/a The Home Depot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vaughn, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vogel v. Home Depot USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sera Swan Vogel
Represented By: Brett Norman Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc. d/b/a The Home Depot
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA, Inc. doing business as Home Depot, The
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Vaughn
Represented By: Scott Douglas Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?