McCoy v. Colorado Springs Housing Authority et al
Plaintiff: Leila McCoy
Defendant: City of Colorado Springs, Lisa (I) Pachecco, North Platte Housing Authority, Colorado Springs Housing Authority, Nadine Garcia, Lisa Pachecco, Colorado Department of Regulatory Agencies, Nadine (I) Garcia, Charlotte Keator-Boyd and Charlotte (I) Keator-Boyd
Case Number: 1:2020cv02392
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #18 MOTION to Add Claim for relief #12 Amended Complaint filed by Prose Filer Leila McCoy. The document was not filed electronically. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.1(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Add Claim for Relief #12 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Leila McCoy. (evana, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 17 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #16 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify filed by attorney Leila McCoy.The document was not filed electronically. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.1(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend #12 Complaint to add Claim for Relief by Plaintiff Leila McCoy. (evana, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 15 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #12 Amended Complaint, #13 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #12 Amended Complaint, #14 MOTION for Order to filed by attorney Leila McCoy.The document was not filed electronically. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.1(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to add defendant by Plaintiff Leila McCoy. (evana, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Amend #12 Amended Complaint to add defendants by Plaintiff Leila McCoy. (evana, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Colorado Springs Housing Authority, Nadine Garcia, Nadine (I) Garcia, Lisa Pachecco, Lisa (I) Pachecco, Charlotte Keator-Boyd, Charlotte (I) Keator-Boyd, filed by Leila McCoy.(rvill, )
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SECOND ORDER to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order within the time allowed the Court may dismiss the Complaint and action in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 16, 2020. (rvill, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable Addressed to Leila McCoy. (apesa, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Leila McCoy (apesa, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #5 Amended Complaint Addressed to Leila McCoy. (apesa, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Leila McCoy. (evana, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to the Court by Plaintiff Leila McCoy (evana, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Colorado Springs, Colorado Department of Regulatory Agencies, Colorado Springs Housing Authority, Nadine Garcia, North Platte Housing Authority, filed by Leila McCoy.(evana, )
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty days from the date of this Order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this Order must include the civil action number on this Order. That Plaintiff Leila McCoy is the only properly named plaintiff named in this action. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/12/2020. (evana, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Leila McCoy. (trvo, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Colorado Springs, Colorado Department of Regulatory Agencies, Colorado Springs Housing Authority, Nadine Garcia, Nadine (I) Garcia, North Platte Housing Authority, Lisa Pachecco, Lisa (I) Pachecco, filed by Leila McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Requests, #3 Envelope)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Colorado Springs Housing Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leila McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Colorado Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa (I) Pachecco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Platte Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Springs Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadine Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Pachecco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Regulatory Agencies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nadine (I) Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte Keator-Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte (I) Keator-Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?