Mossman et al v. Jayco, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Randolph Mossman and Nadine Mossman
Defendant: Jayco, Inc. and K&C RV Centers, LLC a Minnesota limited liability company doing business as Camping World RV Sales
Case Number: 1:2020cv02396
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/8/20. (lgale, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/8/2020. Discovery due by 5/31/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/6/2021. Final Pretrial, Jury Instructions and Trial Preparation Conference set for 1/20/2022 9:30 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.Four Day Jury Trial set for 1/31/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice) (lgale, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Nadine Mossman, Randolph Mossman. (Pipes, Andrew)
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE Notice of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Plaintiffs Nadine Mossman, Randolph Mossman. (Pipes, Andrew)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/24/20. KLM Civil Motions Practice Standards. (nmarb, )
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #13 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/24/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Nadine Mossman, Randolph Mossman All parties consent.. (Pipes, Andrew)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with efforts to minimize the spread of COVID-19, all counsel or parties who wish to participate in, or members of the public who wish to listen into, the Scheduling Conference set on October 8, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. shall do so by TELEPHONE by calling the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, at the time of the hearing. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/21/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand by Jayco, Inc., K&C RV Centers, LLC.(Richardson, Joel)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/4/20 GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Jayco, Inc. answer due 9/10/2020; K&C RV Centers, LLC answer due 9/10/2020.(nmarb, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand by Defendants Jayco, Inc., K&C RV Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Entry of Appearance)(Richardson, Joel)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 28 August 2020. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) shall be held on October 8, 2020, commencing at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado.Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#4-2] is September 24, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/28/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. K&C RV Centers, LLC served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. (Pipes, Andrew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Jayco, Inc. served on 8/13/2020, answer due 9/3/2020. (Pipes, Andrew)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jayco, Inc. and K&C RV Centers, LLC re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Nadine Mossman, Randolph Mossman. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Pipes, Andrew)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAYCO, INC., K&C RV Centers, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7430960)Attorney Andrew Boehme Pipes added to party Nadine Mossman(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Boehme Pipes added to party Randolph Mossman(pty:pla), filed by Randolph Mossman, Nadine Mossman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Pipes, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mossman et al v. Jayco, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Mossman
Represented By: Andrew Boehme Pipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nadine Mossman
Represented By: Andrew Boehme Pipes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayco, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Aaron Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&C RV Centers, LLC a Minnesota limited liability company doing business as Camping World RV Sales
Represented By: Joel Aaron Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?