Celauro v. Federal Express Ground et al
Plaintiff: Sal Celauro, Jr.
Defendant: Robby Baier, Ryan Pelky, Federal Express Ground and Paul Burgelon
Case Number: 1:2020cv02398
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DUPLICATEORDER Denying #5 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/29/2020. (angar, ) Modified on 9/30/2020 to show as duplicate (angar, ).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISREGARD - FILED IN WRONG CASE MINUTE ORDER. On September 28, 2020, Plaintiff filed a letter (ECF No. 30 ), requesting an extension of time to file a Second Amended Prisoner Complaint. This is his second request for an extension of time. (See ECF No. 28 ). Plaintiffs request is GRANTED. If Plaintiff fails to file a Second Amended Prisoner Complaint as directed within the time allowed, the action may be dismissed without further notice. No further extensions of time will be granted without just cause, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/29/2020. (angar, ) Modified on 9/30/2020 to show filed in wrong case (angar, ).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying #5 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/29/2020.(angar, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robby Baier, Paul Burgelon, Federal Express Ground, Ryan Pelky, filed by Sal Celauro, Jr.(angar, )
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Second ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within the time allowed, this action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/15/2020. forms mailed as ordered (angar, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 DISREGARD - FILED IN WRONG CASE Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #3 Order, Addressed to Sal Celauro, Jr.. (angar, ) Modified on 9/1/2020 to show file din wrong case (angar, ).
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form), by Plaintiff Sal Celauro, Jr. (angar, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service, by Plaintiff Sal Celauro, Jr. (angar, )
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on August 13, 2020. (rvill, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robby Baier, Paul Burgelon, Federal Express Ground, Ryan Pelky, filed by Sal Celauro, Jr.(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celauro v. Federal Express Ground et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sal Celauro, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robby Baier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Pelky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Ground
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Burgelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?