O'Connor v. Nathan et al
Plaintiff: Andrew J. O'Connor
Defendant: Marni Nathan Kloster and J. Andrew Nathan
Case Number: 1:2020cv02412
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #7 Order of Dismissal and Denying Plaintiff's Motions to Recuse on September 25, 2020. (rvill, )
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO RECUSE. It is ORDERED that "Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Judge Babcock Pursuant to 28 455 U.S.C." (ECF No. #6 ) is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that "Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Magistrate Judge Gallagher Pursuant to 28 455 U.S.C." (ECF No. #5 ) is DENIED as moot. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) and the action are dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to cure deficiencies within the time allowed and failed to prosecute. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED as moot. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on September 25, 2020. (rvill, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Disqualify Judge Babcock pursuant to 28 455U.S.C., by Plaintiff Andrew J. O'Connor. (evana, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Disqualify Magistrate Judge Gallagher Pursuant to 28 455 U.S.C., by Plaintiff Andrew J. O'Connor. (evana, )
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. That if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/17/2020. (evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor v. Nathan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marni Nathan Kloster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Andrew Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?