Valentine v. JoyVida LLC et al
Plaintiff: Natasha Valentine
Defendant: Kenneth Jenson, JoyVida LLC and JoyVida LLC doing business as Amada Senior Care
Case Number: 1:2020cv02413
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/15/2020. Consent Form due by 11/2/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/2/2020 (jgonz, )
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Kenneth Jenson answer due 10/26/2020; JoyVida LLC answer due 10/26/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/15/2020. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendants Kenneth Jenson, JoyVida LLC. (Dawson, Micah)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Micah David Dawson on behalf of Kenneth Jenson, JoyVida LLCAttorney Micah David Dawson added to party Kenneth Jenson(pty:dft), Attorney Micah David Dawson added to party JoyVida LLC(pty:dft) (Dawson, Micah)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brett M. Wendt on behalf of Kenneth Jenson, JoyVida LLCAttorney Brett M. Wendt added to party Kenneth Jenson(pty:dft), Attorney Brett M. Wendt added to party JoyVida LLC(pty:dft) (Wendt, Brett)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/14/2020. Consent Form due by 10/14/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/14/2020 (jgonz, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $400, receipt number: COX096080. (trvo, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth Jenson, JoyVida LLC (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Daniel L. Chandler added to party Natasha Valentine(pty:pla), filed by Natasha Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Chandler, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valentine v. JoyVida LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Jenson
Represented By: Brett M. Wendt
Represented By: Micah David Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoyVida LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JoyVida LLC doing business as Amada Senior Care
Represented By: Brett M. Wendt
Represented By: Micah David Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Valentine
Represented By: Daniel L. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?