Jackson v. Board of County Commissioners of the County of Grand, The
Plaintiff: Melissa Jackson
Defendant: The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Grand and Board of County Commissioners of the County of Grand, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv02441
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Claire E. Hunter by Claire E. Hunter on behalf of Melissa JacksonAttorney Claire E. Hunter added to party Melissa Jackson(pty:pla) (Hunter, Claire)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 18 August 2020. On or before October 20, 2020, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/27/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/3/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (cmadr, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Grand (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7435958)Attorney Jesse Kay Fishman added to party Melissa Jackson(pty:pla), filed by Melissa Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fishman, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Board of County Commissioners of the County of Grand, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Jackson
Represented By: Jesse Kay Fishman
Represented By: Claire E. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Grand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Grand, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?