Delumeau et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Kramer-Bickner, Elizabeth Delumeau and Mary Lou (I) Kramer- Bickner
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Parke, Davis & Co. and Warner Lambert Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02469
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/2/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 11/18/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/25/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/6/2020. (jgonz, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendants Parke, Davis & Co., Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLC. (Douglas, Matthew)
October 6, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Douglas, Matthew)
October 6, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew J. Douglas on behalf of Parke, Davis & Co., Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLCAttorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Parke, Davis & Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Pfizer, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Pharmacia Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Warner Lambert Company(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Douglas added to party Warner Lambert Company, LLC(pty:dft) (Douglas, Matthew)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER The Court finds the allegations contained in #10 Response to Order to Show Cause sufficient at this stage of the proceedings to satisfy the Court of its subject matter jurisdiction over this lawsuit. Accordingly, #7 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 09/02/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction re #7 by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Delumeau, Mary Lou (I) Kramer- Bickner, Mary Lou Kramer-Bickner. (Kassan, Randi)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Pharmacia LLC f/k/a Pharmacia Corporation, Parke, Davis & Company LLC as successor-in-interest of Parke, Davis & Company and Warner-Lambert Company LLC f/k/a Warner-Lambert Company by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Delumeau, Mary Lou (I) Kramer- Bickner, Mary Lou Kramer-Bickner. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons - Pharmacia LLC, #2 Summons Summons - Warner Lambert Company LLC)(Kassan, Randi)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Delumeau, Mary Lou (I) Kramer- Bickner, Mary Lou Kramer-Bickner. (Kassan, Randi) Modified on 9/2/2020 to correct event (jgonz, ).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Plaintiff why this case should not be dismissed due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/20/2020. (jgonz, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2469-STV (angar, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: Randi Alyson Kassan. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Parke, Davis & Co., Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation, Warner Lambert Company, Warner Lambert Company, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7441434)Attorney Randi Alyson Kassan added to party Elizabeth Delumeau(pty:pla), Attorney Randi Alyson Kassan added to party Mary Lou Kramer-Bickner(pty:pla), filed by Elizabeth Delumeau, Mary Lou Kramer-Bickner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kassan, Randi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delumeau et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Kramer-Bickner
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Delumeau
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lou (I) Kramer- Bickner
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parke, Davis & Co.
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Lambert Company
Represented By: Matthew J. Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?