Taylor v. Weiser
Plaintiff: Christopher Taylor
Defendant: Philip Weiser
Case Number: 1:2020cv02470
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/25/2020, re: #2 the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 is DENIED. ORDERED that Mr. Taylor shall pay $400.00 ($350.00 filing fee, plusa $50.00 administrative fee) within thirty (30) days from the date of this order if he wishes to pursue his claims in this action.(sphil, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/19/2020. ORDERED that Mr. Taylor show cause in writing within thirty (30) days from the date of this order why leave to proceed in forma pauperis should not be denied because he is subject to the filing restriction in 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (sphil, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Christopher Taylor. (trvo, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Philip Weiser, filed by Christopher Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?