O'Connor v. Gallagher
Plaintiff: Andrew J. O'Connor
Defendant: Gordon P. Gallagher
Case Number: 1:2020cv02473
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT re: #7 Order Dismissing Case, by Clerk on 9/24/2020. (evana, )
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE that the Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) and the action are dismissed without prejudice because Plaintiff failed to cure deficiencies within the time allowed and failed to prosecute. That leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice. That all pending motions are DENIED as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/24/2020. (evana, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCIES AND TO SHOW CAUSE within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to thisorder must include the civil action number on this order. That if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. That Plaintiff show cause in writing within thirty days from the date of this Order why this action should not be dismissed as duplicative of OConnor v. Gallagher, 20-cv-1978-KLM. That if Plaintiff fails to show good cause within the timeallowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/24/2020. (evana, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #4 Order of Recusal, This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02473 KLM. (Text Only Entry) (evana, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. I hereby recuse from any further service in this matter, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/18/2020. (evana, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Andrew J. O'Connor. (trvo, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gordon P. Gallagher, filed by Andrew J. O'Connor.(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor v. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon P. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?