Price et al v. The Murder Mystery Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Brandon Price and Megan Onorato
Defendant: The Murder Mystery Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02474
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/24/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 11/17/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #[3-1]) is due on or before 11/17/2020. At the scheduled time, counsel shall call the Court provided conference line at (888) 251-2909 Access Code: 5662814#. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10/9/2020. Text Only Entry (amont, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant The Murder Mystery Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Declaration of Shelby Stremus)(Schwartz, Brian)
October 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Mark Schwartz on behalf of The Murder Mystery Company, LLCAttorney Brian Mark Schwartz added to party The Murder Mystery Company, LLC(pty:dft) (Schwartz, Brian)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Individual, Collective and Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand against The Murder Mystery Company, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7441907)Attorney Shelby Sue Woods added to party Megan Onorato(pty:pla), Attorney Shelby Sue Woods added to party Brandon Price(pty:pla), filed by Brandon Price, Megan Onorato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Join (Price), #2 Exhibit 2 - Consent to Join (Onorato), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Woods, Shelby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price et al v. The Murder Mystery Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Price
Represented By: Adam Murdoch-Kitt Harrison
Represented By: Shelby Sue Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Onorato
Represented By: Adam Murdoch-Kitt Harrison
Represented By: Shelby Sue Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Murder Mystery Company, LLC
Represented By: Brian Mark Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?