Buffington v. Ovintiv USA Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Morgan Buffington
Defendant: Ovintiv USA Inc. and Newfield Exploration Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02477
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Raymond P Moore
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Morgan Buffington. (Liles, William)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER The parties shall participate in the Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2020 10:30 AM TELEPHONICALLY by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/09/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/8/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/8/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02477-RM. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Allen Yeh on behalf of Newfield Exploration Company, Ovintiv USA Inc.Attorney Andrew Allen Yeh added to party Newfield Exploration Company(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Allen Yeh added to party Ovintiv USA Inc.(pty:dft) (Yeh, Andrew)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Ovintiv Inc. for Newfield Exploration Company, Ovintiv USA Inc.. (Crow, Michael)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Newfield Exploration Company, Ovintiv USA Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Crow, Michael)
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Morgan BuffingtonAttorney William R. Liles added to party Morgan Buffington(pty:pla) (Liles, William)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Wells Dunlap on behalf of Morgan BuffingtonAttorney Andrew Wells Dunlap added to party Morgan Buffington(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Michael Carter Crow added to party Newfield Exploration Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Carter Crow added to party Ovintiv USA Inc.(pty:dft) by Newfield Exploration Company, Ovintiv USA Inc..(Crow, Michael)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Plaintiff Morgan Buffington (Josephson, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consents by Plaintiff Morgan Buffington (Josephson, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/22/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 10/8/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/15/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/18/2020. (jgonz, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Newfield Exploration Company, Ovintiv USA Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7442692)Attorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Morgan Buffington(pty:pla), filed by Morgan Buffington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Consent, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Consent, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Josephson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buffington v. Ovintiv USA Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ovintiv USA Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Allen Yeh
Represented By: Michael Carter Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newfield Exploration Company
Represented By: Andrew Allen Yeh
Represented By: Michael Carter Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Buffington
Represented By: Michael Andrew Josephson
Represented By: Andrew Wells Dunlap
Represented By: William R. Liles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?