Garcia v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Suzanne Garcia
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02480
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 September 2020. This Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on October 27, 2020, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/20/2020. (cmadr, )
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/28/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/28/2020, re: #21 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause [Docket No. 20] is hereby DISCHARGED. (sphil, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #20 by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Barker, Nathaniel)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/22/2020. ORDERED that, on or before October 2, 2020, defendant shall show cause as to why this case should not be remanded to state court due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 22 September 2020. In light of the reassignment of this case to the Honorable Philip A. Brimmer, Chief Judge, the Scheduling Conference currently set before this Court on September 24, 2020 is vacated. (cmadr, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Suzanne Garcia. (Drake, Christopher)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02480-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11 September 2020. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) (ECF #15 ), the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company All parties do not consent.. (Barker, Nathaniel)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1 September 2020. Before the Court is Defendant's Response to Order to Show Cause (ECF #13 ). In light of the information provided by Defendant, this Court's Order (ECF #9 ) is discharged. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate JudgeConsent Form (ECF #8 ) on or before September 11, 2020. It is further ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held on September 24, 2020, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/17/2020. (cmadr, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #9 by Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Response to Order to Show Cause)(Barker, Nathaniel)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Michael Drake on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Christopher Michael Drake added to party Suzanne Garcia(pty:pla) (Drake, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Barker, Nathaniel)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jared W. McLuskey on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jared W. McLuskey added to party Suzanne Garcia(pty:pla) (McLuskey, Jared)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 19 August 2020. It is ORDERED that Defendant file a written response to this Order to Show Cause on or before September 2, 2020, demonstrating why the Court should not remand this case (or recommend that it be remanded) for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (cmadr, ) Modified pursuant to #14 on 9/1/2020 (cmadr, ).
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of Complaint and Jury Demand, District Court Civil Cover Sheet upon State Farm Fire and Casualty Company on 07/29/2020. (jtorr, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, filed by Suzanne Garcia.(jtorr, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Heather A. Salg on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty CompanyAttorney Heather A. Salg added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Salg, Heather)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Barker, Nathaniel)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Weld County Court, Case Number 2020cv30524. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7442948), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Barker, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Nathaniel S. Barker
Represented By: Heather A. Salg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Garcia
Represented By: Christopher Michael Drake
Represented By: Jared W. McLuskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?