Lester v. Appextremes, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Lester
Defendant: Appextremes, LLC d/b/a Conga, Apttus Corporation d/b/a Conga, Apttus Corporation a Deleware Corporation doing business as Conga and Appextremes, LLC a Deleware limited liability company doing business as Conga
Case Number: 1:2020cv02482
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 29 September 2020. (cmadr, )
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #24 Joint Motion for Protective Order filed by Apttus Corporation, Appextremes, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/29/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Appextremes, LLC, Apttus Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information)(Goetz-Anderson, Jamie)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/15/2020. (bwilk, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 22 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 9/15/2020 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Parties shall submit a proposed Protective Order on or before 9/29/2020. Discovery and Rule 702 motions due by 3/15/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2021. FTR: NYW-CRD. (bwilk, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Amanda Lester. (Kinkade, Jennifer)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/2/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Registry of Actions by Defendants Appextremes, LLC, Apttus Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Registry of Actions)(Goetz-Anderson, Jamie)
September 1, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #6 Complaint by Appextremes, LLC, Apttus Corporation.(Goetz-Anderson, Jamie)
August 31, 2020 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02482-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Amanda Lester All parties do not consent.. (Kinkade, Jennifer)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Goetz-Anderson, Jamie)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/24/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 9/1/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/8/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/15/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Apttus Corporation, Appextremes, LLC. Apttus Corporation answer due 9/1/2020; Appextremes, LLC answer due 9/1/2020. (Goetz-Anderson, Jamie)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet by Defendants Appextremes, LLC, Apttus Corporation (Panagakos, Melisa)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2482-NYW (angar, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charlotte Noelle Sweeney on behalf of Amanda LesterAttorney Charlotte Noelle Sweeney added to party Amanda Lester(pty:pla) (Sweeney, Charlotte)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer Marie Kinkade on behalf of Amanda LesterAttorney Jennifer Marie Kinkade added to party Amanda Lester(pty:pla) (Kinkade, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (apesa, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Appextremes, LLC, Apttus Corporation, filed by Amanda Lester.(apesa, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (apesa, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (apesa, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Melisa Hallie Panagakos on behalf of Appextremes, LLC d/b/a Conga, Apttus Corporation d/b/a CongaAttorney Melisa Hallie Panagakos added to party Appextremes, LLC d/b/a Conga(pty:dft), Attorney Melisa Hallie Panagakos added to party Apttus Corporation d/b/a Conga(pty:dft) (Panagakos, Melisa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson on behalf of Appextremes, LLC d/b/a Conga, Apttus Corporation d/b/a Conga (Goetz-Anderson, Jamie)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Apttus Corporation d/b/a Conga, Appextremes, LLC d/b/a Conga from Broomfield County District Court, Case Number 2020CV30203. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7443201), filed by Apttus Corporation d/b/a Conga, Appextremes, LLC d/b/a Conga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit State Court Affidavits of Service, #5 Exhibit State Court Entry of Appearance, #6 Exhibit State Court Declaration, #7 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Civil Cover Sheet USDC Civil Cover Sheet)(Goetz-Anderson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lester v. Appextremes, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Lester
Represented By: Charlotte Noelle Sweeney
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Kinkade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appextremes, LLC d/b/a Conga
Represented By: Melisa Hallie Panagakos
Represented By: Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apttus Corporation d/b/a Conga
Represented By: Melisa Hallie Panagakos
Represented By: Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apttus Corporation a Deleware Corporation doing business as Conga
Represented By: Melisa Hallie Panagakos
Represented By: Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appextremes, LLC a Deleware limited liability company doing business as Conga
Represented By: Melisa Hallie Panagakos
Represented By: Jamie M. Goetz-Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?