Mylo v. Cornerstone Apartments
Plaintiff: Les Evan Mylo
Defendant: Cornerstone Apartments
Case Number: 1:2020cv02483
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #8 Order, Addressed to Lee van Mylo. (evana, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #5 Notice (Other) Addressed to Les Evan Mylo. (evana, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #7 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Addressed to Les Evan Mylo. (evana, )
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this Second Order. That if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies as directed within thirty (30) days from the date of this Second Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/28/2020. (evana, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/8/2020. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #6 ) is STRICKEN for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a), which requires conferral with an unrepresented party, unless the unrepresented party also is a prisoner. It does not appear that Plaintiff is a prisoner, thus conferral is required. Further, the motion is premature. This action remains under initial review as required by D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(a).(apesa, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 STRICKEN - MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Cornerstone Apartments. (Muccio, Peter) Modified on 9/8/2020 (apesa, ).
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of proof money order purchase re #4 Order, by Plaintiff Les Evan Mylo (evana, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. That if Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies as directed within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/19/2020. (evana, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1:Passport Photo. (cpomm, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cornerstone Apartments, filed by Les Evan Mylo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Waiver of Summons)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mylo v. Cornerstone Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Apartments
Represented By: Peter Edward Muccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Les Evan Mylo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?