Minchin v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Christopher James Minchin
Defendant: USAO-SS-Noticing, Commissioner, Social Security Administration and SSA Noticing
Case Number: 1:2020cv02486
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/16/2020. Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time To File the Electronic Certified Administrative Record and Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint [#8 ] is granted. Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 12/18/2020.(athom, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schabacker, Noah)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re: #1 Complaint, filed by Christopher James Minchin. Opening and response briefs shall be limited to no more than twenty (20) pages. Reply briefs shall be limited to no more than ten (10) pages. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 08/19/2020. (athom, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 10/18/2020. Text Only Entry (athom, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (alave, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Petition for Review against Andrew M Saul (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7443952)Attorney Ann J. Atkinson added to party Christopher Minchin(pty:pla), filed by Christopher Minchin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Atkinson, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minchin v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Represented By: Noah Michael Schabacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher James Minchin
Represented By: Ann J. Atkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?