Dickerson v. Zayo Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Darrin Dickerson
Defendant: Zayo Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02490
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Plaintiff Darrin Dickerson (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Desai, Reena)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Benjamin L. Davis, III on behalf of Darrin DickersonAttorney Benjamin L. Davis, III added to party Darrin Dickerson(pty:pla) (Davis, Benjamin)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/13/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #10 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02490-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
October 12, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Zayo Group, LLC.(LeBoeuf, Sterling)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Darrin Dickerson All parties do not consent.. (Desai, Reena)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel S. Brome on behalf of Darrin DickersonAttorney Daniel S. Brome added to party Darrin Dickerson(pty:pla) (Brome, Daniel)
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Reena I. Desai on behalf of Darrin DickersonAttorney Reena I. Desai added to party Darrin Dickerson(pty:pla) (Desai, Reena)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathalie Anne Bleuze on behalf of Zayo Group, LLCAttorney Nathalie Anne Bleuze added to party Zayo Group, LLC(pty:dft) (Bleuze, Nathalie)
September 18, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Zayo Group, LLC. Zayo Group, LLC answer due 10/12/2020. (LeBoeuf, Sterling)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Plaintiff Darrin Dickerson (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Srey, Rachhana)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 19 August 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before October 14, 2020, the partiesshall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #3-1). Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/22/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zayo Group, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7444221)Attorney Rachhana T. Srey added to party Darrin Dickerson(pty:pla), filed by Darrin Dickerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dickerson Redacted Consent Form, #2 Exhibit B - Miller and Riedo Redacted Consent forms, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Srey, Rachhana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickerson v. Zayo Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrin Dickerson
Represented By: Rachhana T. Srey
Represented By: Reena I. Desai
Represented By: Benjamin L. Davis, III
Represented By: Daniel S. Brome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zayo Group, LLC
Represented By: Nathalie Anne Bleuze
Represented By: Sterling J. LeBoeuf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?