McGraw et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Angela McGraw and Martin McGraw
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv02497
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathan Brown Thoreson on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Nathan Brown Thoreson added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Thoreson, Nathan)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Nureiter is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/15/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2497-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America All parties do not consent.. (Gorham, Nicole)
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicole King Gorham on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of AmericaAttorney Nicole King Gorham added to party Safeco Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Gorham, Nicole)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Spano, Brian)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer A. Milne on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jennifer A. Milne added to party Angela McGraw(pty:pla), Attorney Jennifer A. Milne added to party Martin McGraw(pty:pla) (Milne, Jennifer)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Martin Roth on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney David Martin Roth added to party Angela McGraw(pty:pla), Attorney David Martin Roth added to party Martin McGraw(pty:pla) (Roth, David)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 20 August 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before October 21, 2020, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #9 ). Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/28/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter.The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The partiesare directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2497-NRN (angar, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (apesa, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Safeco Insurance Company of America on 8/4/2020. (apesa, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Safeco Insurance Company of America, filed by Angela McGraw, Martin McGraw.(apesa, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (apesa, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (apesa, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet State Court Docket, #2 Summons, #3 District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Complaint and Jury Demand, #5 Civil Procedure Order, #6 Return of Service, #7 Pretrial Order)(Spano, Brian)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeco Insurance Company of America from Jefferson County District Court, Case Number 20cv30915. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7445639), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - ROS on Safeco, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Notice of Filing, #5 Exhibit E - State Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spano, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGraw et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela McGraw
Represented By: Jennifer A. Milne
Represented By: David Martin Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin McGraw
Represented By: Jennifer A. Milne
Represented By: David Martin Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Represented By: Nicole King Gorham
Represented By: Nathan Brown Thoreson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?