Nuss v. Noble Energy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Nuss
Defendant: Martha B. Wyrsch, Barbara J. Duganier, Scott D. Urban, Holli C. Ladhani, William T. Van Kleef, James E. Craddock, Jeffrey L. Berenson, David L. Stover, Thomas J. Edelman and Noble Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02499
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Securities, Commodities, Exchange
Cause of Action: 15:10
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 10/7/20. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/7/20 re: #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case filed by David Nuss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. (nmarb, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff David Nuss (Sadeh, Daniel)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/11/20 GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Noble Energy, Inc. answer due 10/29/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/20 AT 10:30 AM is VACATED and RESET to 11/23/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.(nmarb, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond and Continue Scheduling Conference by Defendant Noble Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Terwey, Margaret)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Nuss. Noble Energy, Inc. served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Sadeh, Daniel)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 08/24/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/29/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 10/6/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey L. Berenson, James E. Craddock, Barbara J. Duganier, Thomas J. Edelman, Holli C. Ladhani, Noble Energy, Inc., David L. Stover, Scott D. Urban, William T. Van Kleef, Martha B. Wyrsch (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7445751)Attorney Daniel Sadeh added to party David Nuss(pty:pla), filed by David Nuss. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sadeh, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nuss v. Noble Energy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha B. Wyrsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara J. Duganier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holli C. Ladhani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T. Van Kleef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Craddock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey L. Berenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret D. Terwey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Nuss
Represented By: Daniel Sadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?