Bedoy et al v. NBCUniversal Media, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eragdi Adriana Macias and Miguel Bedoy
Defendant: Telemundo of Denver LLC d/b/a KDEN-TV, NBCUniversal Media, LLC and Telemundo of Denver LLC doing business as KDEN-TV
Case Number: 1:2020cv02548
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Meaghan Elaine Fischer on behalf of Miguel Bedoy, Eragdi Adriana MaciasAttorney Meaghan Elaine Fischer added to party Miguel Bedoy(pty:pla), Attorney Meaghan Elaine Fischer added to party Eragdi Adriana Macias(pty:pla) (Fischer, Meaghan)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference and for Protective Order Staying Discovery. Discovery is stayed. Status Report due by 12/21/2020, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/8/2020.(jgonz, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery and Vacate Scheduling Conference filed by Telemundo of Denver LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/7/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Stay Discovery and Vacate Scheduling Conference by Defendants NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Telemundo of Denver LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gartenberg, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Charles Gartenberg on behalf of NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Telemundo of Denver LLCAttorney David Charles Gartenberg added to party NBCUniversal Media, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Charles Gartenberg added to party Telemundo of Denver LLC(pty:dft) (Gartenberg, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Erin Ashley Webber on behalf of NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Telemundo of Denver LLCAttorney Erin Ashley Webber added to party NBCUniversal Media, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Erin Ashley Webber added to party Telemundo of Denver LLC(pty:dft) (Webber, Erin)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eragdi Adriana Macias, Miguel Bedoy. Telemundo of Denver LLC waiver sent on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Wegener, Benjamin)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eragdi Adriana Macias, Miguel Bedoy. NBCUniversal Media, LLC waiver sent on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Wegener, Benjamin)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/21/2020 01:15 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/14/2020, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/25/2020. (jgonz, )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/26/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/26/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Telemundo of Denver LLC d/b/a KDEN-TV (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7452081)Attorney Benjamin Michael Wegener added to party Miguel Bedoy(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Michael Wegener added to party Eragdi Adriana Macias(pty:pla), filed by Eragdi Adriana Macias, Miguel Bedoy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons NBCUniversal Media, #3 Summons Telemundo)(Wegener, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bedoy et al v. NBCUniversal Media, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telemundo of Denver LLC d/b/a KDEN-TV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Represented By: Erin Ashley Webber
Represented By: David Charles Gartenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telemundo of Denver LLC doing business as KDEN-TV
Represented By: Erin Ashley Webber
Represented By: David Charles Gartenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eragdi Adriana Macias
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Wegener
Represented By: Meaghan Elaine Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Bedoy
Represented By: Benjamin Michael Wegener
Represented By: Meaghan Elaine Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?