Miller v. Lipinski et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Miller
Defendant: Brain Trust, Adam Lipinski and Brain Trust, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02600
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:2707
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #26 Stipulation for Temporary Injunction Relief. The Court adopts the Stipulation as an Order of the Court. FURTHER ORDERED that the Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 10/20/2020 is VACATED. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/14/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
October 14, 2020 Filing 26 STIPULATION re 19 Order, #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE HEARING by Defendants Brain Trust, LLC, Adam Lipinski. (Groh, William)
October 9, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE HEARING filed by Plaintiff Crystal Miller. (Attachments: #1 Crystal Miller's Declaration in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Koelsch, Vandana)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying #15 Motion for Leave to Restrict. There is not sufficient information for the requested document to be restricted. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/6/2020. Text Only Entry(cmasec)
September 30, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Brain Trust, LLC, Adam Lipinski.(Groh, William)
September 25, 2020 Filing 22 BRIEF in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE HEARING filed by Defendants Brain Trust, LLC, Adam Lipinski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List for Defendant, #2 Declaration of Adam Lipinski with Exhibits)(Groh, William)
September 25, 2020 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Groh, William)
September 25, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by William Carl Groh, III on behalf of Brain Trust, LLC, Adam Lipinski (Groh, William)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Pursuant to correspondence between counsel and Chambers staff, a VTC Motion Hearing is set for a full day on 10/20/2020, at 09:00 AM before Judge Christine M. Arguello. Counsel are directed to contact my Courtroom Deputy via email (Socorro_West@cod.uscourts.gov) on or before 10/15/2020 for instructions on how to proceed with VTC. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/25/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/2/2020 10:30 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Parties are asked to file a proposed scheduling order one week prior. Parties Shall call 888-363-4749, Access 3136546# at the time of the hearing. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 24, 2020. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Juo on behalf of Brain Trust, LLC, Adam Lipinski Attorney James Juo added to party Brain Trust, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney James Juo added to party Adam Lipinski (pty:dft) (Juo, James)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Crystal Miller. Adam Lipinski waiver sent on 9/11/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Koelsch, Vandana)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Crystal Miller. (Koelsch, Vandana)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crystal Miller. Brain Trust, LLC served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Koelsch, Vandana)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Brain Trust, LLC re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crystal Miller. (Koelsch, Vandana)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Adam Lipinski re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Crystal Miller. (Koelsch, Vandana)
August 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Eagle County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 20-cv-02600-CMA-GPG. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/29/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #3 ) is DENIED IN PART AND RESERVED IN PART. The Motion is denied as to Plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order. The Court reserves judgment on whether a preliminary injunction should issue; Plaintiff shall serve the Complaint, along with a summons, a copy of her Motion (Doc. #3 ), and this Order, on Defendants on or before September 11, 2020; Plaintiff shall file a certificate of service on or before September 14, 2020; Defendants shall file a Response to the Motion on or before September 25, 2020; Once Defendants are served, the parties shall jointly contact Chambers at Arguello_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to set a preliminary injunction hearing; and Plaintiffs Motion for Writ of Pre- Judgment Attachment Against Adam Lipinski and Brain Trust, LLC (Doc. #2 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a) (duty to confer), by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/28/2020.(evana, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/28/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 UN-RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Master Services Agreement to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Crystal Miller.. (Koelsch, Vandana) (Modified on 9/2/2020 edited to add the title of the text to the entry)(evana, ). (Modified on 10/6/2020 to Un-restrict pursuant to the 24 Order) (evana, ).
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE re: #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE HEARING, #1 Complaint,, #2 MOTION for Issuance of Writ of Pre-judgment Attachment Against Adam Lipinski and Brain Trust, LLC by Plaintiff Crystal Miller. (Koelsch, Vandana)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND REQUEST FOR IMMEDIATE HEARING by Plaintiff Crystal Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Koelsch, Vandana)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Writ of Pre-judgment Attachment Against Adam Lipinski and Brain Trust, LLC by Plaintiff Crystal Miller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Koelsch, Vandana)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief, Theft of Intellectual Property, Breach of Fiduciary Duty and An Accounting/Apportionment against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7458420)Attorney Vandana Koelsch added to party Crystal Miller(pty:pla), filed by Crystal Miller. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit of Crystal Miller, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Koelsch, Vandana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Lipinski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Miller
Represented By: Vandana Koelsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brain Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Lipinski
Represented By: William Carl Groh, III
Represented By: James Juo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brain Trust, LLC
Represented By: William Carl Groh, III
Represented By: James Juo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?