NIMBL Worldwide Inc. v. Williams
Plaintiff: NIMBL Worldwide Inc.
Defendant: Evan Williams
Case Number: 1:2020cv02609
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Mailing/Service re #12 Minute Order,, by Plaintiff NIMBL Worldwide Inc.. (Field, Elizabeth)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 16 October 2020. This matter comes before the Court following a communication, indicating that the parties are engaged in settlement conversations. In light of that information, the Scheduling Conference set for October 29, 2020 is vacated and rescheduled to December 17, 2020, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/10/2020. (cmadr, )
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/14/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/14/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Minute Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02609-RM. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/9/2020. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (jgonz, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff NIMBL Worldwide Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Nitta, Chad)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NIMBL Worldwide Inc.. Evan Williams served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Nitta, Chad)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 31 August 2020. The parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF 4-1) on or before October 9, 2020. It is ORDERED that the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held on October 29, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/22/2020. (cmadr, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Techedge, SpA for NIMBL Worldwide Inc.. (Field, Elizabeth)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Evan Williams (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7459440)Attorney Chad Takashi Nitta added to party NIMBL Worldwide Inc.(pty:pla), filed by NIMBL Worldwide Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nitta, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NIMBL Worldwide Inc. v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIMBL Worldwide Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Julianne Field
Represented By: Chad Takashi Nitta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?