Burns v. 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Margaret Burns
Defendant: 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC doing business as 10 Barrel Brewing Co., Anheuser-Busch, LLC, 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC a limited liability company doing business as 10 Barrel Brewing Co. and Anheuser-Busch, LLC a limited liability company doing business as 10 Barrel Brewing Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02618
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Anheuser-Busch, LLC by Defendants 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC, Anheuser-Busch, LLC. (Gonzales, Amber)
October 13, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew J. Reh on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Matthew J. Reh added to party 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J. Reh added to party Anheuser-Busch, LLC(pty:dft) (Reh, Matthew)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #18 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/30/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
September 30, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Shawn Sar on behalf of Margaret BurnsAttorney Jonathan Shawn Sar added to party Margaret Burns(pty:pla) (Sar, Jonathan)
September 30, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas William Temming on behalf of Margaret BurnsAttorney Nicholas William Temming added to party Margaret Burns(pty:pla) (Temming, Nicholas)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/30/2020. In light of the #19 Response to Order to Show Cause, filed by 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC, Anheuser-Busch, LLC, the #14 Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #14 by Defendants 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC, Anheuser-Busch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Gonzales, Amber)
September 24, 2020 Filing 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC, Anheuser-Busch, LLC All parties consent.. (Gonzales, Amber)
September 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Jonathan Sar by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Margaret Burns (Leventhal, Sean)
September 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Nick Temming by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Margaret Burns (Leventhal, Sean)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Text Only Entry Consent Form due by 9/25/2020. (nmarb, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/11/20 returnable by Defendants as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 9/25/2020. Consent form due by 9/25/20. (nmarb, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sean Bradley Leventhal on behalf of Margaret BurnsAttorney Sean Bradley Leventhal added to party Margaret Burns(pty:pla) (Leventhal, Sean)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of state court Pretrial Order by Defendants 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC, Anheuser-Busch, LLC (Gonzales, Amber)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of state court Answer by Defendants 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC, Anheuser-Busch, LLC (Gonzales, Amber)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of state court Register of Actions by Defendants 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC, Anheuser-Busch, LLC (Gonzales, Amber)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Craft USA Holdings, LLC for 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC; Corporate Parent Anheuser-Busch Companies, LLC for Anheuser-Busch, LLC. (Gonzales, Amber)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Amended Complaint and Jury Demand upon Anheuser-Busch, LLC dba 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC on 07/29/2020. (alave, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND JURY DEMAND against 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC, Anheuser-Busch, LLC, filed by Margaret Burns.(alave, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Plainitff of Removal by Defendants 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC, Anheuser-Busch, LLC (Gonzales, Amber)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anheuser-Busch, LLC, 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC from Denver District Court, State of CO, Case Number 2020cv32206. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7460884), filed by Anheuser-Busch, LLC, 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gonzales, Amber)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Burns
Represented By: Jonathan Shawn Sar
Represented By: Nicholas William Temming
Represented By: Sean Bradley Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC doing business as 10 Barrel Brewing Co.
Represented By: Amber Rose Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch, LLC
Represented By: Amber Rose Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 10 Barrel Brewing, LLC a limited liability company doing business as 10 Barrel Brewing Co.
Represented By: Amber Rose Gonzales
Represented By: Matthew J. Reh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anheuser-Busch, LLC a limited liability company doing business as 10 Barrel Brewing Co.
Represented By: Amber Rose Gonzales
Represented By: Matthew J. Reh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?