Residents of 2202 North Downing Street v. Shorter Arms Investors LLC et al
Plaintiff: Residents of 2202 North Downing Street
Defendant: PK Management LLC and Shorter Arms Investors LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02647
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #7 Order of Dismissal, #8 Clerk's Judgment Addressed to Residents of 2202 North Downing Street. (athom, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #7 Order of Dismissal on October 9, 2020. (rvill, )
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure for the failure of Plaintiffs, Residents of 2202 North Downing Street, to comply with the September 1, 2020 Order Directing Plaintiffs to Cure Filing Deficiencies and to prosecute this action. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis is denied for the purpose of appeal. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ' 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438 (1962). If Plaintiffs file a notice of appeal they must also pay the full $505 appellate filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit within thirty days in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 24. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are denied as moot. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on October 9, 2020. (rvill, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #1 Complaint, 3 Case Assigned to Judge, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Addressed to Residents of 2202 North Downing Street. (Attachments: #1 Mail Returned, #2 Mail Returned) (apesa, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 Conventionally Submitted Material : 1 Flash Drive Text Only Entry (apesa, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. ORDERED that Plaintiffs cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Plaintiffs shall obtain copies of the court-approvedforms for filing an Application for Leave to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) and a Complaint, along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. If Plaintiffs fail to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/1/2020. (apesa, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Residents of 2202 North Downing Street. (jsalz, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PK Management LLC, Shorter Arms Investors LLC, filed by Residents of 2202 North Downing Street.(jsalz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Residents of 2202 North Downing Street v. Shorter Arms Investors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PK Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorter Arms Investors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Residents of 2202 North Downing Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?