Brito v. Citadel Crossing Associates LLC
Plaintiff: Carlos Brito
Defendant: Citadel Crossing Associates LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02650
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12181
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #13 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses. The deadline to file a motion to strike is extended to November 4, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/21/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Plaintiff Carlos Brito. (Perez, Anthony)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: #11 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/19/2020. (jgonz, )
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/19/2020. Discovery due by 6/8/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/8/2021. (jgonz, )
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #9 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/19/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Carlos Brito All parties consent.. (Perez, Anthony)
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Carlos Brito. (Perez, Anthony)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jeffrey S. Vail added to party Citadel Crossing Associates LLC(pty:dft) by Citadel Crossing Associates LLC.(Vail, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Brito. Citadel Crossing Associates LLC served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Perez, Anthony)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/9/2020. Consent Form due by 10/19/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/19/2020. (jgonz, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cpomm, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Citadel Crossing Associates LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7464854)Attorney Anthony J. Perez added to party Carlos Brito(pty:pla), filed by Carlos Brito. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brito v. Citadel Crossing Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Crossing Associates LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Vail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Brito
Represented By: Anthony J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?