Katt v. PaulsCorp, LLC
Plaintiff: David Katt
Defendant: PaulsCorp, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02670
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the reassignment of this case to this Court the Scheduling Conference set 11/12/2020 before Magistrate Judge Vaholak is vacated. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, this Court will not hold a scheduling conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 11/5/2020 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/30/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
October 29, 2020 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02670-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
October 29, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant PaulsCorp, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Baca, Elisa)
October 14, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Pauls Capital LLC for PaulsCorp, LLC. (Fine, Robert)
October 14, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by PaulsCorp, LLC.(Fine, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher J. Neumann on behalf of PaulsCorp, LLCAttorney Christopher J. Neumann added to party PaulsCorp, LLC(pty:dft) (Neumann, Christopher)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elisa Hevia Baca on behalf of PaulsCorp, LLCAttorney Elisa Hevia Baca added to party PaulsCorp, LLC(pty:dft) (Baca, Elisa)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant PaulsCorp, LLC. PaulsCorp, LLC answer due 10/14/2020. (Fine, Robert)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Katt. PaulsCorp, LLC served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Marcus, Ari)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 DISREGARD, FILED INTO INCORRECT CASE SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (cmadr, ) Modified to add notice on 9/2/2020 (cmadr, ).
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/12/2020 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 10/29/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/5/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/1/2020. (jgonz, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PAULSCORP, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7465833)Attorney Ari Hillel Marcus added to party DAVID KATT(pty:pla), filed by DAVID KATT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Marcus, Ari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katt v. PaulsCorp, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Katt
Represented By: Ari Hillel Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PaulsCorp, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Neumann
Represented By: Elisa Hevia Baca
Represented By: Robert Stewart Fine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?