Tonti Management Co., Inc. et al v. Soggy Doggie, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tonti Management Co., Inc. and APMT, LLC
Defendant: M. Michele Tonti and Soggy Doggie, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02725
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 101 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Plaintiffs APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redlined First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bell, Shannon)
October 23, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew R. Lee on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Andrew R. Lee added to party APMT, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew R. Lee added to party Tonti Management Co., Inc.(pty:pla) (Lee, Andrew)
October 15, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Justin Paul Lemaire on behalf of Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele TontiAttorney Justin Paul Lemaire added to party Soggy Doggie, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Justin Paul Lemaire added to party M. Michele Tonti(pty:dft) (Lemaire, Justin)
October 15, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew David Mendez on behalf of Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele TontiAttorney Andrew David Mendez added to party Soggy Doggie, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew David Mendez added to party M. Michele Tonti(pty:dft) (Mendez, Andrew)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Minute Order: Setting Status Conference. This matter was recently transferred from the Eastern District of Louisiana. As such, the Court is setting a Status Conference for 11-19-2020 at 9:00am in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The Parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 11-12-2020. The Joint Status Report shall inform the Court of the following: (1) the Parties' activities in Discovery; (2) whether the Parties have any outstanding discovery disputes; (3) whether the Parties intend to file Summary Judgment Motions or Rule 702 Motions; and (4) the prospect of reaching a settlement in this matter. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form #90 is due 11-12-2020. Dial in information for the Status Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 09-28-2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
September 24, 2020 Filing 96 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Vandana Koelsch on behalf of Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele TontiAttorney Vandana Koelsch added to party Soggy Doggie, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Vandana Koelsch added to party M. Michele Tonti(pty:dft) (Koelsch, Vandana)
September 24, 2020 Filing 95 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer E. Schlatter on behalf of Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele TontiAttorney Jennifer E. Schlatter added to party Soggy Doggie, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer E. Schlatter added to party M. Michele Tonti(pty:dft) (Schlatter, Jennifer)
September 24, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patrick D. Vellone on behalf of Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele TontiAttorney Patrick D. Vellone added to party Soggy Doggie, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick D. Vellone added to party M. Michele Tonti(pty:dft) (Vellone, Patrick)
September 18, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shannon Marie Bell on behalf of APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc.Attorney Shannon Marie Bell added to party APMT, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Shannon Marie Bell added to party Tonti Management Co., Inc.(pty:pla) (Bell, Shannon)
September 18, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William James Kelly, III on behalf of APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc.Attorney William James Kelly, III added to party APMT, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney William James Kelly, III added to party Tonti Management Co., Inc.(pty:pla) (Kelly, William)
September 9, 2020 Filing 91 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (trvo, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 90 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 89 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 88 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 87 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-13134. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Case transferred to District of Colorado. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue (Rec. Doc. 11) is GRANTED and this matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Rec. Doc. 10) is hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/8/20.(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on August 12, 2020 before Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Court Reporter/Recorder Cathy Pepper, Telephone number 504-589-7779. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2020. (rsg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 84 Supplemental Memorandum filed by M. Michele Tonti, in Support of #61 MOTION for Protective Order and in Opposition to #60 Second Motion to Compel. (Lemaire, Justin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 24, 2020 Filing 83 Supplemental Memorandum filed by All Plaintiffs, in Support of #60 Second MOTION to Compel and in Opposition to #61 Motion for Protective Order, as Ordered by the Court [80 p. 11, 82]. (Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING #81 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. IT IS ORDERED that Motion is GRANTED, modifying the Court's Order (R. Doc. #80 ), as follows: Plaintiffs shall file their supplemental brief on or before August 24, 2020. Defendants shall file their supplemental brief on or before September 3, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/20/2020. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Filing 81 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Andrew) Modified on 8/20/2020 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to compel (ECF No. #54 ) is DENIED, Plaintiffs' Second Motion to compel (ECF No. #60 ) is DEFERRED, and Defendant's Motion for second supplemental protective order (ECF No. #61 ) is DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs file a supplemental brief addressing the bad faith element of their federal cybersquatting claim by August 21, 2020, and Defendant file a supplemental brief on that issue by August 31, 2020. Oral argument, if needed, will be held on September 9, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties hold their Rule 26(f) conference on or before August 21, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/13/2020. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 8/12/2020 before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: A video conference hearing was held on this date to address Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Responsive Materials (ECF No. #54 ); Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Compel (ECF No. #60 ); and (3) Defendant Michele Tonti's Motion for Second Supplemental Protective Order (ECF No. #61 ). After oral argument, the matter was taken under submission. An order setting out the reasons for my ruling will be separately issued. Signed by Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/12/2020. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 78 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc. re #60 Second MOTION to Compel. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING #72 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/10/2020. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc. re #54 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests Propounded to Defendant, M. Michele Tonti. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING #71 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/10/2020. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by M. Michele Tonti re #61 MOTION for Supplemental Protective Order. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING #70 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/10/2020. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 72 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum (in support of R. Doc. 60) by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 71 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum (in support of R. Doc. 54) by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 70 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Reply filed by M. Michele Tonti re 61 MOTION for Protective Order . Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Mendez, Andrew) Modified event and text on 8/10/2020 (cg). Modified on 8/11/2020 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 10, 2020 Filing 69 FILED IN ERROR---SEE REC DOC. 70--REPLY to Response to Motion filed by M. Michele Tonti re 61 MOTION for Protective Order . (Mendez, Andrew) Modified on 8/10/2020 (cg). Modified on 8/11/2020 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the oral argument scheduled for Wednesday August 12, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests (ECF No. #54 ) and Second Motion to Compel (ECF No. #60 ), and Defendant M. Michele Tonti's Motion for Protective Order (ECF No. #61 ) will be held via Zoom.gov. A log-in invitation for the video conference will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/7/2020.(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 67 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc. regarding #54 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests Propounded to Defendant, M. Michele Tonti, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bremenstul, Minia) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 66 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc. regarding #60 Second MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bremenstul, Minia) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 65 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs regarding #61 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 64 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #61 MOTION for Protective Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 63 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by M. Michele Tonti re #60 Second MOTION to Compel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Mendez, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 62 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by M. Michele Tonti re #54 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests Propounded to Defendant, M. Michele Tonti, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Lemaire, Justin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 61 MOTION for Protective Order by M. Michele Tonti. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Mendez, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/29/2020: #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4) (sa). Modified to attach Exhibits 1-4 on 7/29/2020 (sa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 60 Second MOTION to Compel by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 1-A, #4 Notice of Submission)(Lee, Andrew) Modified referral on 7/21/2020 (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING #58 MOTION to Continue Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED, and the submission date for Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Rec. Doc. #54 ) be and it hereby is CONTINUED and RESET to the 12th day of August, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 7/21/2020.(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 58 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by M. Michele Tonti. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flores, Madeline) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 20, 2020 Filing 57 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on June 17, 2020 before Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Court Reporter/Recorder Mary Thompson, Telephone number 504-589-7783. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/19/2020. (rsg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 56 Supplemental Memorandum filed by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc., in Opposition of #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION to Dismiss Case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 7/15/2020. (cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION to Compel Responses to Discovery Requests Propounded to Defendant, M. Michele Tonti, by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Notice of Submission)(Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 53 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (R. Doc. 10) by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10, #5 Exhibit 11, #6 Exhibit 12)(Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele Tonti re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Case. (cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele Tonti re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case. (cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum; granting #49 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 7/14/2020. (cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 49 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Rule 12 Motion in Excess of Page Limit by Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele Tonti. (Attachments: #1 Reply, #2 Proposed Order)(Mendez, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 13, 2020 Filing 48 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue by Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele Tonti. (Attachments: #1 Reply, #2 Proposed Order)(Mendez, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Minia E. Bremenstul for APMT, LLC and Tonti Management Co., Inc. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 7/7/20. (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 45 RESPONSE to Motion filed by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc. re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss Case . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
July 6, 2020 Filing 44 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and #11 MOTION to Transfer Case. The motions will be submitted before Judge Barbier on July 15, 2020, without oral argument unless otherwise notified. Having confirmed a schedule with Judge Barbier; IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Tonti Management Co., Inc. and APMT, LLC must file their opposition memorandum no later than July 6, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Soggy Doggie, LLC and M. Michele Tonti must file their reply memorandum no later July 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/26/2020. (NEF: Section J) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's #30 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/25/2020. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 41 AMENDED RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by M. Michele Tonti re #30 MOTION to Compel Production of Certain Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted by Defendant as Privileged. (Attachments: #1 Amended Declaration)(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING #39 Motion for Leave to file Amended Opposition & Declaration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/24/2020. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
June 23, 2020 Filing 39 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Amend/Correct #33 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, by M. Michele Tonti. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support Amended Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit Amended Declaration)(Flores, Madeline) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault: Motion Hearing held on 6/17/2020 re #30 MOTION to Compel Production of Certain Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted by Defendant as Privileged. Plaintiffs' motion is SUBMITTED. An order setting out the reasons for my ruling will be separately issued. Signed by Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/17/2020. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc. re #30 MOTION to Compel Production of Certain Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted by Defendant as Privileged. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING #35 Motion for Leave to File Reply in Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/15/2020. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 35 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and to File Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Compel (Doc. 30) by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc.. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Reply Memorandum, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by M. Michele Tonti re #30 MOTION to Compel Production of Certain Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted by Defendant as Privileged . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Lemaire, Justin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #31 Request for Oral Argument re: #30 MOTION to Compel. IT IS ORDERED that oral argument be and is hereby GRANTED and the Motion is SET for the 17th day of June, 2020 at 11:00 am. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any Reply Memoranda be filed by the 12th day of June, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/26/2020.(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 31 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc. regarding #30 MOTION to Compel Production of Certain Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted by Defendant as Privileged . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
May 19, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Compel Production of Certain Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted by Defendant as Privileged by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Notice of Submission)(Lee, Andrew) Modified referral on 5/20/2020 (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr: Status Conference held on 5/7/2020. The purpose of the conference was to discuss the privilege-related discovery issues raised in the letter submitted to the court by plaintiffs' counsel, which has separately been filed in the record. The following schedule applies to resolution of these issues: Defendants must complete related supplemental production of documents no later than MAY 11, 2020. Counsel must confer in good faith and narrow their dispute as much as possible to particularly identified materials no later than MAY 13, 2020. No later than MAY 19, 2020, plaintiffs must file a motion to compel, noticed for submission on JUNE 10, 2020. No later than JUNE 2, 2020, defendants must (1) file their opposition memorandum attaching any necessary evidence and a Bates stamped, redacted version of the documents at issue as they have actually been produced to plaintiffs, and (2) deliver to the magistrate judge's office, an unredacted mirror image of the documents at issue for this court's in camera review. Plaintiffs are hereby granted leave to file a reply to defendants' opposition memorandum, attaching any necessary evidence, no later than JUNE 8, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/7/2020. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Filing 28 Letter to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. from Attorney Andrew R. Lee dated May 6, 2020. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #26 Joint Motion for Protective Order. IT IS ORDERED that the Supplemental Protective Order is entered into this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/26/2020. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
March 25, 2020 Filing 26 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Protective Order by M. Michele Tonti. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Supplemental Protective Order)(Flores, Madeline) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #24 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/9/2020. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Protective Order Per Court's February 12, 2020 Minute Entry by M. Michele Tonti, Tonti Management Co., Inc. and APMT, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lemaire, Justin) Modified on filers 3/9/2020 (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the deadline by which counsel must submit the proposed protective order to me is hereby EXTENDED to March 6, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/20/2020.(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
February 19, 2020 Filing 22 Correspondence to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. from Attorney Justin P. Lemaire dated February 19, 2020. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Minute Order for Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr: Conference held on 2/13/2020. IT IS ORDERED that #14 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, as set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than February 19, 2020, counsel must jointly and cooperatively (1) identify a neutral third-party vendor to process and maintain the subject data, (2) gather additional information concerning the quantity of materials subject to the subpoena and a time frame for review, and (3) submit to me a proposed protective order containing the terms discussed during the telephone conference. Having conferred with Judge Barbier, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the March 25, 2020 submission date, Record Doc. No. 16, for the Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss, Record Doc. No. #10 , and the Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue, Record Doc. No. #11 , is hereby CONTINUED, to be reset upon input from counsel to me as to a reasonable schedule by which the materials subject to the subpoena may be reviewed, non-privileged materials may be produced, a privilege log may be provided, and briefing on the pending motions may be completed. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/13/2020. (NEF: Section J) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by M. Michele Tonti re #14 MOTION for Protective Order. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 2/11/2020. (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Protective Order by M. Michele Tonti. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Lemaire, Justin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
February 4, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc. re #14 MOTION for Protective Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum in Opposition, #2 Exhibit 1-A to Memorandum in Opposition)(Rench, Tyler) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 MOTION to Continue Submission Dates. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that that the submission dates for the following motions filed by Defendants are hereby continued to March 25, 2020: Rule 12 Motion to Dismiss (Rec. Doc. 10) and Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) (Rec. Doc. 11). Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/22/2020.(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Dates by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
January 22, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Protective Order by M. Michele Tonti. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1- Declaration of M. Michele Tonti, #3 Exhibit 1A- Sample TMCI Employment Agreement, #4 Exhibit 2- Notice of Subpoena, #5 Exhibit 3- Proposed Protective Order, #6 Notice of Submission)(Lemaire, Justin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record for Attorney Madeline Flores for Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele Tonti. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/7/2020. (clw) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele Tonti. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mendez, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case by Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele Tonti. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Notice of Submission)(Mendez, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss Case by Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele Tonti. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Notice of Submission)(Mendez, Andrew) (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/7/2020) (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Soggy Doggie, LLC answer due 1/14/2020; M. Michele Tonti answer due 1/6/2020. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/10/2019. (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Soggy Doggie, LLC, M. Michele Tonti. (Attachments: #1 Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, #2 Proposed Order)(Mendez, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (R. Doc. 4) is hereby DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with leave to re-file at a later date, if needed, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/13/2019.(cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION for Consent Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunctive Relief by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc., Soggy Doggie, LLC and M. Michele Tonti (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rench, Tyler) Modified filers on 11/13/2019 (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs regarding #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by APMT, LLC, Tonti Management Co., Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 1: Declaration of S. Tonti (redacted), #4 Exhibit 1-A, #5 Exhibit 1-B, #6 Exhibit 1-C, #7 Exhibit 1-D, #8 Exhibit 1-E, #9 Exhibit 1-F, #10 Exhibit 1-G, #11 Exhibit 1-H, #12 Exhibit 1-I, #13 Exhibit 1-J, #14 Exhibit 2, #15 Exhibit 3, #16 Exhibit 4, #17 Exhibit 5, #18 Exhibit 6, #19 Exhibit 7, #20 Exhibit 8, #21 Exhibit 9)(Lee, Andrew) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Soggy Doggie, LLC. (cg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7904254) filed by Tonti Management Co., Inc., APMT, LLC. (Attachments: #1Exhibit 1, #2Exhibit 2, #3Exhibit 3, #4Exhibit 4, #5Exhibit 5, #6Exhibit 6, #7Exhibit 7, #8Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons)Attorney Andrew Russell Lee added to party APMT, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew Russell Lee added to party Tonti Management Co., Inc.(pty:pla).(Lee, Andrew) (Attachment 9 replaced on 10/16/2019) (cg). (Attachment 10 replaced on 10/16/2019) (cg). Modified text, summons and civil cover sheet on 10/16/2019 (cg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tonti Management Co., Inc. et al v. Soggy Doggie, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonti Management Co., Inc.
Represented By: Andrew R. Lee
Represented By: Shannon Marie Bell
Represented By: William James Kelly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APMT, LLC
Represented By: Andrew R. Lee
Represented By: Shannon Marie Bell
Represented By: William James Kelly, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Michele Tonti
Represented By: Vandana Koelsch
Represented By: Justin Paul Lemaire
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Patrick D. Vellone
Represented By: Jennifer E. Schlatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soggy Doggie, LLC
Represented By: Vandana Koelsch
Represented By: Justin Paul Lemaire
Represented By: Andrew David Mendez
Represented By: Patrick D. Vellone
Represented By: Jennifer E. Schlatter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?