Nickell v. Dillon Companies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Virginia Nickell
Defendant: MCW-RC III Hilltop Village, LLC, Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King Soopers and Dillon Companies, LLC doing business as King Soopers
Case Number: 1:2020cv02751
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2020 Filing 17 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02751-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Dillon Companies, LLC, MCW-RC III Hilltop Village, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Vaughn, Katherine)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 11/19/2020 11:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 11/5/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/12/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/28/2020. (jgonz, )
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER The Court finds #13 Response to Order to Show Cause sufficient at this stage of the proceedings to satisfy the Court of its subject matter jurisdiction over this lawsuit. Accordingly, #10 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 09/28/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #10 Order to Show Cause by Defendants Dillon Companies, LLC, MCW-RC III Hilltop Village, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Vaughn, Katherine)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #10 by Plaintiff Virginia Nickell. (Levy, Jason)
September 17, 2020 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Dillon Companies, LLC, MCW-RC III Hilltop Village, LLC.(Vaughn, Katherine)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Defendants why the case should not be dismissed due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 9/25/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/11/2020. (jgonz, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jason David Levy on behalf of Virginia NickellAttorney Jason David Levy added to party Virginia Nickell(pty:pla) (Levy, Jason)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint-pd 192. (alave, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint and Jury Demand upon MCW-RC III Hilltop Village, LLC on 08/13/2020. (alave, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, and Complaint and Jury Demand upon Dillon Companies, LLC doing business as King Soopers on 08/11/2020 (alave, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COMPLAINTAND JURY DEMAND against Dillon Companies, LLC, MCW-RC III Hilltop Village, LLC, filed by Virginia Nickell.(alave, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MCW-RC III Hilltop Village, LLC, Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King Soopers from Adams County District Court, Case Number 2020CV31051. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7481211), filed by MCW-RC III Hilltop Village, LLC, Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King Soopers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vaughn, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nickell v. Dillon Companies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Nickell
Represented By: Jason David Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCW-RC III Hilltop Village, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King Soopers
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC doing business as King Soopers
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?