Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C. v. EM Fitness, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C.
Defendant: FT Three, L.L.C., FT Poland, L.L.C., EM Fitness, L.L.C., Erin Mellinger, Axio Fitness Canfield, L.L.C., Axio Fitness Poland, L.L.C. and Axio Fitness Howland, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02757
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING #51 Motion for Leave to Restrict. The court finds that Plaintiff has met its burden to restrict the listed documents under Level 1 pursuant to Loc. Civ. R. 7.2. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain the following ECF Documents under Level 1 Restriction: ECF Nos. 46-1; 46-3 through 46-6; 46-15 through 46-21; 46-24; 46-31; 46-39; 46-40; and 46-43 through 46-45. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/30/2020. Text Only Entry(dddlc3, )
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING #50 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The parties indicate that the Franchisee Defendants waived service on September 30, 2020, rendering their answer or response due November 29, 2020. Because that is a Sunday, the court finds it appropriate to clarify that under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26, the due date will extend to the following Monday on November 30, 2020. So all defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before November 30, 2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/30/2020. Text Only Entry(dddlc3, )
October 29, 2020 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Romero, Melissa)
October 29, 2020 Filing 50 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by Defendants Axio Fitness Canfield, L.L.C., Axio Fitness Howland, L.L.C., Axio Fitness Poland, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Westbrook, Nicole)
October 21, 2020 Filing 49 RECEIPT of $50,000.00 from Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C. for Security Bond re: #47 Order. (athom, )
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 16 October 2020. The Court shall hold a scheduling conference on: December 2, 2020 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall participate in the conference by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/25/2020. (cmadr, )
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying Axio Defendants' #22 Motion to Dismiss and Granting in Part Fitness Together Franchise LLC's #14 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/16/2020. (athom, ) Modified on 10/16/2020 to correct linkage in text (athom, ).
October 6, 2020 Filing 46 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibits for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Stephanie Hu, #2 Exhibit 2 - U.S. Trade Mark Registration Nos., #3 Exhibit 3 - September 30, 2011 Franchise Agreement (Poland) and Consent to Transfer, #4 Exhibit 4 - September 17, 2013 Franchise Agreement (Howland), #5 Exhibit 5 - August 20, 2018 Franchise Agreement (Canfield), #6 Exhibit 6 - July 30, 2020 Voluntary Termination and Release Agreement, #7 Exhibit 7 - Axio Fitness Ohio Registrations (07-28-20), #8 Exhibit 8 - Emails re change to Axio Fitness, #9 Exhibit 9 - Draft email re change to Axio Fitness, #10 Exhibit 10 - Emails Forwarding Trainer Application, #11 Exhibit 11 - Emails Forwarding Trainer Application, #12 Exhibit 12 - Emails re Mellinger equipment purchase, #13 Exhibit 13 - Emails re Mellinger equipment purchase, #14 Exhibit 14 - Emails re Mellinger equipment purchase, #15 Exhibit 15 - Emails from Vinnie Zimbardi to Client, #16 Exhibit 16 - Emails between Vinnie Zimbardi and Client, #17 Exhibit 17 - Emails between Vinnie Zimbardi and Clients, #18 Exhibit 18 - Emails between Vinnie Zimbardi and Client, #19 Exhibit 19 - Emails between Lauren Bevan and Client, #20 Exhibit 20 - Email forwarding Axio Fitness Weekly Report, #21 Exhibit 21 - Emails between Adam Catauro and Client, #22 Exhibit 22 - Emails confirming Boulevard Walkabout, #23 Exhibit 23 - August 26, 2020 Email re Axio Fitness logo, #24 Exhibit 24 - Emails between Brian Gustafson and Client, #25 Exhibit 25 - Email re Fitness Together Weekly Recipe, #26 Exhibit 26 - August 4, 2020 forward of July 29, 2020 Fitness Together email to Axio, #27 Exhibit 27 - August 19, 2020 Emails re Banking, #28 Exhibit 28 - Emails re Graphic Design work, #29 Exhibit 29 - Email re logo design, #30 Exhibit 30 - Email re logo design, #31 Exhibit 31 - Axio and Nutrition Together, #32 Exhibit 32 - Website Printouts for Axio Fitness, #33 Exhibit 33 - Website Printout - EM Fitness in Canfield, OH, US _ Mindbody (09-24-20), #34 Exhibit 34 - Facebook pages for Axio Fitness, #35 Exhibit 35 - August 29, 2020 Wellbiz Report - Fitness Together-Canfield, #36 Exhibit 36 - September 3, 2020 Wellbiz Report - Fitness Together-Howland, #37 Exhibit 37 - September 3, 2020 Wellbiz Report - Fitness Together-Poland, #38 Exhibit 38 - September 10, 2020 Wellbiz Report - Fitness Together-Poland, #39 Exhibit 39 - April 14, 2020 Email from Erin Mellinger to Stephanie Hu, #40 Exhibit 40 - April 16-17, 2020 Emails re Mellinger Franchise Buyouts, #41 Exhibit 41 - April 19, 2020 email registering Axio Fitness domain name, #42 Exhibit 42 - April 20, 2020 email from Erin Mellinger re Axio Fitness logo, #43 Exhibit 43 - April 22-24, 2020 Emails re Erin's VT&R, #44 Exhibit 44 - June 23-24, 2020 emails re Release Agreement Exhibits, #45 Exhibit 45 - July 1, 2020 email re Mindbody, #46 Exhibit 46 - Affidavit of Erin Mellinger (Defendants' Exhibit))(Romero, Melissa) Modified on 10/8/2020 to add title of document (athom, ).
October 6, 2020 Filing 45 MINUTE ENTRY for Motions Hearing held before Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/6/2020. Court Reporter: Tracy Weir. (pglov)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART #43 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Restrict Public Access. The court GRANTS Plaintiff's request to restrict the #31 Plaintiff's Response and the #38 Axio Defendants' Reply. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain ECF Nos. 31, 31-1, 31-2, 31-3, and 38 under Level 1 Restricted Access. But Plaintiff's request to restrict public access to the Preliminary Injunction Hearing "where either party references or discusses specific terms in the Franchise and Termination Agreements, the substance of negotiations related to the Termination Agreement, the contents of FTF's confidential Nutrition Together guide, and FTF's clients' confidential data and information" is overbroad. Most of the arguments at the hearing likely will concern form contract clauses addressing arbitration, injunctive relief, forum selection, and non-competition. The court expects that these issues will pervade the whole hearing. And Plaintiff has not met its burden of (1) showing what interest exactly outweighs the presumption of public access; (2) showing what clearly defined and serious injury would result if those portions of the hearing are not restricted; and (3) explaining why no alternative means of restriction is practicable. See Loc. Civ. R. 7.2(c). To the extent the parties will need to address sensitive client information or the actual substance of Plaintiff's trade secrets--rather than just their existence--the court will entertain oral requests to restrict a small portion at the end of the hearing. Counsel will be expected to avoid discussing the substance of actual trade secrets unless absolutely necessary. If such a discussion is necessary, counsel should save any such portions of their discussion for the end of the hearing to minimize disruption of the publicly available access line. But the court will not restrict portions of the hearing simply where the parties need to address clauses in the franchise or termination agreements. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/5/2020. Text Only Entry(dddlc3, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Romero, Melissa)
October 2, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE (Joint Notice of Stipulation) by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C. (Reilly, Kathryn)
October 1, 2020 Filing 41 MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held before Judge Daniel D. Domenico: Status Conference held on 10/1/2020. Court Reporter: Julie Thomas. (pglov)
October 1, 2020 Filing 40 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (athom, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 39 REPLY In Support to Response to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendants Axio Fitness Canfield, L.L.C., Axio Fitness Howland, L.L.C., Axio Fitness Poland, L.L.C. (Public Entry for Level 1 Restricted Document #38 ). Text Only Entry (athom, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 38 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Defendants Axio Fitness Canfield, L.L.C., Axio Fitness Howland, L.L.C., Axio Fitness Poland, L.L.C... (Bengtson, Blaine)
September 30, 2020 Filing 37 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Axio Fitness Poland, L.L.C. by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C.. (Reilly, Kathryn)
September 30, 2020 Filing 36 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Axio Fitness Howland, L.L.C. by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C.. (Reilly, Kathryn)
September 30, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Axio Fitness Canfield, L.L.C. by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C.. (Reilly, Kathryn)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #25 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Restrict. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain the following ECF documents at Level 1 Restricted Access: ECF No. 2; ECF Nos. 2-4 through 2-8; ECF No. 4; ECF No. 4-1; ECF Nos. 4-5 through 4-9; ECF No. 13; ECF Nos. 13-4 through 13-8; ECF No. 14; ECF No. 14-1; ECF Nos. 14-5 through 14-10; ECF Nos. 14-17 through 14-19; and ECF No. 14-21. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/29/2020. Text Only Entry(dddlc3, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 34 RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Reply in Support to 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C. (Public Entry for Level 1 Restricted Document #31 ). Text Only Entry (athom, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 32 Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff's Response to the Axio Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Reply in Support of its Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23, #2 Exhibit 24, #3 Exhibit 25, #4 Exhibit 29, #5 Exhibit 30, #6 Exhibit 31, #7 Exhibit 32, #8 Exhibit 33, #9 Exhibit 34, #10 Exhibit 35 - Proposed Order)(Reilly, Kathryn)
September 28, 2020 Filing 31 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26, #2 Exhibit 27, #3 Exhibit 28)(Reilly, Kathryn)
September 28, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE (Joint Notice of Filing Witness and Exhibit Lists) by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Witness Lists, #2 Exhibit 2 - Exhibit Lists)(Romero, Melissa)
September 28, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Estimate of Time for Cross-Examination by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C. (Romero, Melissa)
September 28, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Estimate of Time for Cross-Examination by Defendants Axio Fitness Canfield, L.L.C., Axio Fitness Howland, L.L.C., Axio Fitness Poland, L.L.C., EM Fitness, L.L.C., FT Poland, L.L.C., FT Three, L.L.C., Erin Mellinger (Westbrook, Nicole)
September 25, 2020 Filing 27 Exhibit List (Joint Exhibit List for Plaintiff and Defendants) by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C.. (Romero, Melissa)
September 25, 2020 Filing 26 Witness List (Preliminary Injunction Hearing Joint Witness List) by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C.. (Romero, Melissa)
September 25, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Romero, Melissa)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss Briefing. The due date for Plaintiff's reply for the preliminary injunction motion, currently set for 9/25/2020, is vacated. Instead, Plaintiff may file a single brief on or before 9/28/2020 that jointly addresses the Franchisee Defendants' response to the preliminary injunction motion (Doc. #23 ) and the Axio Defendants' motion to dismiss. (Doc. #22 .) That brief shall not exceed 6,500 words. The Axio Defendants may file a reply on or before 9/30/2020 addressing any arguments raised in Plaintiff's brief. That reply shall not exceed 6,500 words. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR ADDIOTNAL INFORMATION. By Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 09/23/2020. (athom, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE to 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants EM Fitness, L.L.C., FT Poland, L.L.C., FT Three, L.L.C., Erin Mellinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Westbrook, Nicole)
September 22, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Axio Fitness Canfield, L.L.C., Axio Fitness Howland, L.L.C., Axio Fitness Poland, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bengtson, Blaine)
September 22, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Blaine K. Bengtson by Blaine Kenneth Bengtson on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Blaine Kenneth Bengtson added to party Axio Fitness Canfield, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Blaine Kenneth Bengtson added to party Axio Fitness Howland, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Blaine Kenneth Bengtson added to party Axio Fitness Poland, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Blaine Kenneth Bengtson added to party EM Fitness, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Blaine Kenneth Bengtson added to party FT Poland, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Blaine Kenneth Bengtson added to party FT Three, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Blaine Kenneth Bengtson added to party Erin Mellinger(pty:dft) (Bengtson, Blaine)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Proposed Order in Light of a New Material Fact by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C. The court takes Plaintiff's Amended Proposed Order, filed concurrently with Plaintiff's #19 Motion for Leave, under advisement. Plaintiff does not need to re-file the Amended Proposed Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/22/2020. Text Only Entry(dddlc3, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Proposed Order in Light of a New Material Fact by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Proposed Order)(Reilly, Kathryn) Modified on 9/22/2020 to add a Level 1 Restriction - Counsel will be filing a Motion for Leave to Restrict (athom, ).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/17/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #11 Notice of Entry of Appearance for Nicole A. Westbrook and Blaine K. Bengtson, #12 Notice of Entry of Appearance of Blaine K. Bengtson filed by attorney Nicole A. Westbrook. The format for the attorneys signature block is not correct. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). Also these documents do not contain attorney Bengtson's s/ signature. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases), attorney Blaine Kenneth Bengtson must re-file the above referenced document which must contain his s/ signature using his own log in and password. (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C. (Public Entry for Level 1 Restricted Document #14 ). Text Only Entry (athom, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against EM Fitness, L.L.C., FT Poland, L.L.C., FT Three, L.L.C., Erin Mellinger, Axio Fitness Howland, L.L.C., Axio Fitness Canfield, L.L.C., Axio Fitness Poland, L.L.C., filed by Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C. (Public Entry for Level 1 Restricted #13 ). Text only Entry (athom, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Reilly, Kathryn)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Reilly, Kathryn)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Blaine K. Bengtson by Nicole A. Westbrook on behalf of EM Fitness, L.L.C., FT Poland, L.L.C., FT Three, L.L.C., Erin Mellinger (Westbrook, Nicole)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Nicole A. Westbrook and Blaine K. Bengtson by Nicole A. Westbrook on behalf of EM Fitness, L.L.C., FT Poland, L.L.C., FT Three, L.L.C., Erin MellingerAttorney Nicole A. Westbrook added to party EM Fitness, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole A. Westbrook added to party FT Poland, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole A. Westbrook added to party FT Three, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole A. Westbrook added to party Erin Mellinger(pty:dft) (Westbrook, Nicole)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: 3 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. To the extent Plaintiff requests issuance of a temporary restraining order without notice to Defendants and an opportunity for Defendants to be heard, that request is DENIED. Plaintiff may amend its motion for TRO into a motion for a preliminary injunction on or before 9/15/2020. Defendants shall file a response not to exceed 6,500 words to the motion for TRO or amended motion for preliminary injunction on or before 9/22/2020, and Plaintiff may file a reply not to exceed 3,700 words on or before 9/25/2020. A Preliminary Injunction Hearing is SET for 10/6/2020 at 9:00 AM by video teleconference ("VTC"). Refer to the attached Order for prehearing procedures and deadlines. A VTC Status Conference is SET for 10/1/2020 at 10:30 AM to discuss procedures and logistics for the Preliminary Injunction Hearing. No parties, attorneys, witnesses, or members of the public may attend the Status Conference or the Preliminary Injunction Hearing in person. Members of the public may attend the Status Conference and the Preliminary Injunction Hearing by teleconference at (866) 390-1828, using Access Code 9792296#. All persons participating in court proceedings remotely by VTC or teleconference are prohibited, under penalty of contempt, from recording or broadcasting the proceeding in any manner. Plaintiff is directed to serve Defendants with a copy of this Order no later than 9/14/2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/11/2020. (dddlc1, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Melissa Lawson Romero on behalf of Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C.Attorney Melissa Lawson Romero added to party Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C.(pty:pla) (Romero, Melissa)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jtorr, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 UNRESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C. (Reilly, Kathryn) Modified to add title on 9/11/2020 (jtorr, ). Modified on 9/29/2020 to unrestrict (athom, ).
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Reilly, Kathryn) Modified to add title on 9/11/2020 (jtorr, ).
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Complaint and Jury Demand by Plaintiff Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Reilly, Kathryn) Modified to add title on 9/11/2020 (jtorr, ).
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 Public Entry for ECF #2 Restricted - Level 1: Complaint and Jury Demand against EM Fitness, L.L.C., FT Poland, L.L.C., FT Three, L.L.C., Erin Mellinger (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7482173)Attorney Kathryn A. Reilly added to party Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C.(pty:pla), filed by Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reilly, Kathryn) Modified to add linkage on 9/11/2020 (jtorr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C. v. EM Fitness, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FT Three, L.L.C.
Represented By: Nicole A. Westbrook
Represented By: Blaine Kenneth Bengtson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FT Poland, L.L.C.
Represented By: Nicole A. Westbrook
Represented By: Blaine Kenneth Bengtson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EM Fitness, L.L.C.
Represented By: Nicole A. Westbrook
Represented By: Blaine Kenneth Bengtson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Mellinger
Represented By: Nicole A. Westbrook
Represented By: Blaine Kenneth Bengtson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axio Fitness Canfield, L.L.C.
Represented By: Nicole A. Westbrook
Represented By: Blaine Kenneth Bengtson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axio Fitness Poland, L.L.C.
Represented By: Nicole A. Westbrook
Represented By: Blaine Kenneth Bengtson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axio Fitness Howland, L.L.C.
Represented By: Nicole A. Westbrook
Represented By: Blaine Kenneth Bengtson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fitness Together Franchise, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kathryn A. Reilly
Represented By: Melissa Lawson Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?