McEntire et al v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marc McEntire and Karen McEntire
Defendant: Tyson Poultry, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), Tyson Chicken, Inc., Koch Foods, Inc., Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Koch Meat Co., Inc. doing business as Koch Poultry Co., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Tyson Breeders, Inc., Perdue Foods, LLC and Tyson Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02764
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM regarding #36 Unopposed MOTION to Stay For a Stay of Rule 12 Deadlines and Discovery Pending Resolution of First-To-File Dismissal and 28 U.S.C. 1407 Motions. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/4/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/4/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
November 3, 2020 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2764-PAB (angar, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 38 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #37 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02764-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 37 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc., Perdue Foods, LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Shea, Kevin)
October 23, 2020 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to Stay For a Stay of Rule 12 Deadlines and Discovery Pending Resolution of First-To-File Dismissal and 28 U.S.C. 1407 Motions by Defendants Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc. Koch Foods, Inc. , Perdue Foods, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Shea, Kevin) Modified on 10/23/2020 to correct filers (angar, ).
October 23, 2020 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Perdue Farms, Inc. for Perdue Foods, LLC. (Goldberg, Gregory)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER: Due to an unavoidable scheduling conflict, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 12/2/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/25/2020. Consent Form due by 11/10/2020. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/22/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gregory E. Goldberg on behalf of Perdue Foods, LLCAttorney Gregory E. Goldberg added to party Perdue Foods, LLC(pty:dft) (Goldberg, Gregory)
October 21, 2020 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Koch Foods, Inc. for Koch Meat Co., Inc.. (Pedigo, Scott)
October 21, 2020 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Koch Foods, Inc. for Koch Foods, Inc.. (Pedigo, Scott)
October 21, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott Walker Pedigo on behalf of Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc. Attorney Scott Walker Pedigo added to party Koch Foods, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Scott Walker Pedigo added to party Koch Meat Co., Inc. (pty:dft) (Pedigo, Scott)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/20/2020. Plaintiffs shall respond to the #21 Motion to Dismiss by no later than 11/18/2020. Defendants shall file a reply thereto by no later than 12/16/2020. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carrie C. Mahan on behalf of Pilgrim's Pride CorporationAttorney Carrie C. Mahan added to party Pilgrim's Pride Corporation(pty:dft) (Mahan, Carrie)
October 20, 2020 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Pilgrim's Pride Corporation for Pilgrim's Pride Corporation. (Baumann, Frederick)
October 20, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Caitlin C. McHugh on behalf of Pilgrim's Pride CorporationAttorney Caitlin C. McHugh added to party Pilgrim's Pride Corporation(pty:dft) (McHugh, Caitlin)
October 20, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Frederick J. Baumann by Frederick J. Baumann on behalf of Pilgrim's Pride CorporationAttorney Frederick J. Baumann added to party Pilgrim's Pride Corporation(pty:dft) (Baumann, Frederick)
October 20, 2020 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to the First-To-File Rule by Plaintiffs Karen McEntire, Marc McEntire. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schutte, Kevin)
October 16, 2020 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Tyson Foods, Inc. for Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc.. (Adcox, Rachel)
October 14, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lee Allen Mickus on behalf of Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc. Attorney Lee Allen Mickus added to party Koch Foods, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lee Allen Mickus added to party Koch Meat Co., Inc. (pty:dft) (Mickus, Lee)
October 14, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to the First-To-File Rule by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shea, Kevin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Related Cases by Defendants Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) (Shea, Kevin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Shea, Kevin)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sanderson Farms, Inc. for Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division). (Pepper, Stacy)
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stacy L. Pepper on behalf of Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)Attorney Stacy L. Pepper added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stacy L. Pepper added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division)(pty:dft), Attorney Stacy L. Pepper added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division)(pty:dft), Attorney Stacy L. Pepper added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)(pty:dft) (Pepper, Stacy)
October 14, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christa C. Cottrell on behalf of Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)Attorney Christa C. Cottrell added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christa C. Cottrell added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division)(pty:dft), Attorney Christa C. Cottrell added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division)(pty:dft), Attorney Christa C. Cottrell added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)(pty:dft) (Cottrell, Christa)
October 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel E. Laytin on behalf of Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)Attorney Daniel E. Laytin added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel E. Laytin added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division)(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel E. Laytin added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division)(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel E. Laytin added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)(pty:dft) (Laytin, Daniel)
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathryn Ellen Guilfoyle on behalf of Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)Attorney Kathryn Ellen Guilfoyle added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Ellen Guilfoyle added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division)(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Ellen Guilfoyle added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division)(pty:dft), Attorney Kathryn Ellen Guilfoyle added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)(pty:dft) (Guilfoyle, Kathryn)
October 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kevin M. Shea on behalf of Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)Attorney Kevin M. Shea added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M. Shea added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division)(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M. Shea added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division)(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M. Shea added to party Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)(pty:dft) (Shea, Kevin)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bradley David Justus on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc.Attorney Bradley David Justus added to party Tyson Breeders, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley David Justus added to party Tyson Chicken, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley David Justus added to party Tyson Foods, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley David Justus added to party Tyson Poultry, Inc.(pty:dft) (Justus, Bradley)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kail Janak Jethmalani on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc.Attorney Kail Janak Jethmalani added to party Tyson Breeders, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kail Janak Jethmalani added to party Tyson Chicken, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kail Janak Jethmalani added to party Tyson Foods, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kail Janak Jethmalani added to party Tyson Poultry, Inc.(pty:dft) (Jethmalani, Kail)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rachel Johanna Adcox on behalf of Tyson Breeders, Inc., Tyson Chicken, Inc., Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Poultry, Inc.Attorney Rachel Johanna Adcox added to party Tyson Breeders, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Johanna Adcox added to party Tyson Chicken, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Johanna Adcox added to party Tyson Foods, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rachel Johanna Adcox added to party Tyson Poultry, Inc.(pty:dft) (Adcox, Rachel)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karen McEntire, Marc McEntire. Pilgrim's Pride Corporation waiver sent on 9/20/2020, answer due 11/19/2020. (Schutte, Kevin)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karen McEntire, Marc McEntire. Tyson Breeders, Inc. waiver sent on 9/23/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Tyson Chicken, Inc. waiver sent on 9/23/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Tyson Foods, Inc. waiver sent on 9/23/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Tyson Poultry, Inc. waiver sent on 9/23/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Schutte, Kevin)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karen McEntire, Marc McEntire. Koch Foods, Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020; Koch Meat Co., Inc. waiver sent on 9/24/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Schutte, Kevin)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/24/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 11/10/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/17/2020 Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/24/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karen McEntire, Marc McEntire. Perdue Foods, LLC waiver sent on 9/15/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Schutte, Kevin)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Karen McEntire, Marc McEntire. Sanderson Farms, Inc. waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020; Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division) waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020; Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division) waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020; Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division) waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Schutte, Kevin)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7483538)Attorney Kevin Thomas Schutte added to party Karen McEntire(pty:pla), Attorney Kevin Thomas Schutte added to party Marc McEntire(pty:pla), filed by Karen McEntire, Marc McEntire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schutte, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McEntire et al v. Tyson Foods, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc McEntire
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Schutte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen McEntire
Represented By: Kevin Thomas Schutte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Poultry, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Johanna Adcox
Represented By: Kevin M. Shea
Represented By: Bradley David Justus
Represented By: Kail Janak Jethmalani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division)
Represented By: Daniel E. Laytin
Represented By: Christa C. Cottrell
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Guilfoyle
Represented By: Stacy L. Pepper
Represented By: Kevin M. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Chicken, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Johanna Adcox
Represented By: Kevin M. Shea
Represented By: Bradley David Justus
Represented By: Kail Janak Jethmalani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Shea
Represented By: Scott Walker Pedigo
Represented By: Lee Allen Mickus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilgrim's Pride Corporation
Represented By: Frederick J. Baumann
Represented By: Kevin M. Shea
Represented By: Carrie C. Mahan
Represented By: Caitlin C. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koch Meat Co., Inc. doing business as Koch Poultry Co.
Represented By: Kevin M. Shea
Represented By: Scott Walker Pedigo
Represented By: Lee Allen Mickus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division)
Represented By: Daniel E. Laytin
Represented By: Christa C. Cottrell
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Guilfoyle
Represented By: Stacy L. Pepper
Represented By: Kevin M. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel E. Laytin
Represented By: Christa C. Cottrell
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Guilfoyle
Represented By: Stacy L. Pepper
Represented By: Kevin M. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division)
Represented By: Daniel E. Laytin
Represented By: Christa C. Cottrell
Represented By: Kathryn Ellen Guilfoyle
Represented By: Stacy L. Pepper
Represented By: Kevin M. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Breeders, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Johanna Adcox
Represented By: Kevin M. Shea
Represented By: Bradley David Justus
Represented By: Kail Janak Jethmalani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perdue Foods, LLC
Represented By: Gregory E. Goldberg
Represented By: Kevin M. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel Johanna Adcox
Represented By: Kevin M. Shea
Represented By: Bradley David Justus
Represented By: Kail Janak Jethmalani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?