Doe v. Wang
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Paul Wang
Case Number: 1:2020cv02765
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
2 Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM regarding #10 MOTION to Continue Rule16(b) Scheduling Conference filed by Jane Doe, #11 MOTION for Protective Order and to proceed under a pseudonym filed by Jane Doe. Motions #10 and #11 are referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/5/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
November 4, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Protective Order and to proceed under a pseudonym by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Doe, Jane)
November 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue Rule16(b) Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Doe, Jane)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 15 September 2020. This Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on November 30, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/23/2020. (cmadr, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Complaint and Jury Trial Demand for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Marshal Service Form) (trvo, )
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERENCE to United States Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on September 15, 2020. (rvill, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rvill, )
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Drawing Case. Upon completion of the Court's review of the Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(a), the Court has determined that this case does not appear to be appropriate for summary dismissal. Case randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson for all further proceedings and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02765-RBJ. The Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. 4 ) is GRANTED. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 14, 2020. (rvill, ) Modified to correct text on 9/14/2020 (rvill, ).
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Jane Doe. Public Entry for ECF No. #2 (cpomm, ) Modified to correct text on 9/16/2020 (rvill, ).
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 3: by Plaintiff Jane Doe.. (cpomm, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Paul Wang, filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Request for Protective Order, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Request for Service via USMS, #5 Magistrate Judge Consent Form, #6 Electronic Filing Application, #7 Proposed Document, #8 Envelope)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?