Morris v. MPC Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marcus Morris
Defendant: MPC Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Platte River Inspection Services and MPC Holdings, Inc. doing business as Platte River Inspection Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv02840
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Status Conference held on 9/28/2021 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Dispositive Motions due by 7/8/2022. Fact Discovery due 6/10/2022. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/4/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall file their proposed pretrial order through CM/ECF and include a courtesy copy of the proposed order in Word format sent by email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the conference... FTR: NYW-FTR. (bwilk, )
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant MPC Holdings, Inc.. (Schacht, Nathan)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the court on the Parties' #43 Second Joint Status Report, wherein the Parties request that the Status Conference set for September 14, 2021 be vacated and reset. The Parties' request is hereby GRANTED. The September 14, 2021 Status Conference is vacated and reset for September 28, 2021 at 11:30 a.m. All participants shall call 888-363-4749, Passcode: 5738976# to attend. On or before September 24, 2018, the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report outlining what discovery has been taken to date, what discovery is outstanding, and the proposed schedule for outstanding discovery, dispositive motions, and the Final Pretrial Conference. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/14/2021. Text Only Entry(nywlc3, )
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM regarding #43 MOTION for Order to filed by MPC Holdings, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/14/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant MPC Holdings, Inc.. (Schacht, Nathan) Modified on 9/13/2021 to correct event type. (alave, ).
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION. Plaintiffs' Renewed Expedited Motion for Conditional Certification and Notice to Putative Class Members (Doc. #32 ) is GRANTED; An FLSA collective action of the following individuals is hereby conditionally certified: All current and former inspectors who worked for or on behalf of Platte River Inspection Services and who were paid according to it is day rate pay plan in the past three (3) years (the "Day Rate Inspectors"); Plaintiff's proposed Notice of Collective Action Lawsuit (Doc. # 32-6) is APPROVED; Plaintiff may send a single reminder notice by email to the putative class members after 30 days. The parties shall confer in an attempt to agree on the form of the reminder notice. If the parties are unable to agree, they shall so notify the Court by filing a joint summary of the dispute, not to exceed 3 double-spaced pages, within 14 days of the date of this Order, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/9/2021.(evana, )
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STANDING ORDER: As of August 16, 2021, the public health risks caused by the coronavirus, and in particular, the Delta variant of the coronavirus, continue to be present. In order to support public health efforts to cabin the spread of the coronavirus, to protect the health of the Parties and counsel by minimizing their need to travel, and to protect the health of the general public, the following measures are adopted in an abundance of caution. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED THAT: (1) All proceedings, except with respect to any evidentiary proceedings, including but not limited to trials, which are scheduled to occur through January 1, 2022 and before the undersigned, shall be held via telephone conference, unless otherwise ordered by the court. Participants may access this court's conference line by using the following dial-in information: 1-888-363-4749, Access Code 5738976. This Amended Standing Order does not apply to any criminal matters; evidentiary civil matters; or other matters specifically set after the effective date to be in-person, presently scheduled through January 1, 2022; (2) All jury trials scheduled to occur through January 1, 2022 shall proceed as scheduled, pursuant to the District of Colorado's Jury Trial Protocols and its effective General Order(s), available at http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/CourtOperations/COVID-19Guidance.aspx; and (3) Parties and/or counsel are advised to check information on the website of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado (http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/) and specifically, for Magistrate Judge Wang, for continuing information. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/19/2021. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Status Conference held on 6/22/2021 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. A telephonic Status Conference is set for 9/14/2021 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall call 888-363-4749, Passcode: 5738976# to attend. A Joint Status Report is due 9/10/2021. FTR: NYW-FTR. (bwilk, )
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant MPC Holdings, Inc.. (Schacht, Nathan)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities In Support of Defendant's #35 Response to Motion, by Defendant MPC Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schacht, Nathan)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY to Response to #32 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class and Issue Court-Authorized Notice filed by Plaintiff Marcus Morris. (Fitz, Carl)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Plaintiff Marcus Morris (Josephson, Michael)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE to #32 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class and Issue Court-Authorized Notice filed by Defendant MPC Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and supporting Exhibits 1-A through 1-F, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Schacht, Nathan)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Granting #33 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendant shall have up to and including 3/5/2021 within which to file its Response to #32 Plaintiff's Renewed Expedited Motion for Conditional Certification and Notice to Putative Class Members. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/22/2021. Text Only Entry(cmasec)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class and Issue Court-Authorized Notice by Defendant MPC Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schacht, Nathan)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Renewed MOTION to Certify Class and Issue Court-Authorized Notice by Plaintiff Marcus Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Morris, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Boutte, #3 Exhibit 3 - Offer Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pay Summary, #5 Exhibit 5 - Timesheets, #6 Exhibit 6 - Proposed Notice and Consent, #7 Exhibit 7 - Web Article, #8 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Fitz, Carl)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER striking #30 Motion to Certify Class for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 2/2/2021. Text Only Entry(cmasec)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STRICKEN by Doc. # 31 -- MOTION to Certify Class and Issue Court-Authorized Notice by Plaintiff Marcus Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Morris, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Boutte, #3 Exhibit 3 - Offer Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - Pay Summary, #5 Exhibit 5 - Timesheets, #6 Exhibit 6 - Proposed Notice and Consent, #7 Exhibit 7 - Web Article)(Fitz, Carl) Modified on 2/2/2021 (cmasec).
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATED RULE 502(D) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 23 December 2020. (cmadr, )
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 18 December 2020. (cmadr, )
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM regarding #26 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order and Stipulated Rule 502(d)Order filed by MPC Holdings, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/18/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order and Stipulated Rule 502(d)Order by Defendant MPC Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Ex. B - Stipulated Rule 502(d) Order)(Schacht, Nathan)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Proposed Scheduling Order - Plaintiff's Supplement by Plaintiff Marcus Morris. (Fitz, Carl)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 12/4/2020 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Plaintiff shall supplement the Scheduling Order with a good faith estimate of the computation of damages on or before December 9, 2020. Parties shall submit a proposed Protective Order on or before December 18, 2020. Deadline to file a Motion for Certification: January 29, 2021. FTR: NYW-FTR. (bwilk, )
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CIVIL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4 December 2020. Discovery due by 12/10/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 1/18/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/8/2022. Status Report due by 6/18/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2022 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Status Conference set for 6/22/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (cmadr, )
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Defendant MPC Holdings, Inc.. (Knettel, Paul)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark D. Temple on behalf of MPC Holdings, Inc.Attorney Mark D. Temple added to party MPC Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft) (Temple, Mark)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the Parties' email communications with the chambers of the undersigned in response to this court's 18 Minute Order, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference is SET for 12/4/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/30/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Paul M. Knettel on behalf of MPC Holdings, Inc.Attorney Paul M. Knettel added to party MPC Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft) (Knettel, Paul)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: This action is before the court sua sponte after review of the Parties' proposed Scheduling Order. Due to the court's docket and the number of issues in dispute identified by the Parties, this court finds that it is appropriate to VACATE the Scheduling Conference set for December 2, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. and RESET the Scheduling Conference for a time when the court has more than 30 minutes on its docket for the setting. The Parties are DIRECTED to email the chambers of Magistrate Judge Wang regarding their availability on December 4, 2020 at 1:00 p.m., 2:00 p.m., or 3:00 p.m. MST. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/30/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Proposed Scheduling Order Joint by Plaintiff Marcus Morris. (Fitz, Carl)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/16/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Schacht, Nathan)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MPC Holdings, Inc..(Schacht, Nathan)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02840-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant MPC Holdings, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Schacht, Nathan)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathan Andrew Schacht on behalf of MPC Holdings, Inc.Attorney Nathan Andrew Schacht added to party MPC Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft) (Schacht, Nathan)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference is RESET for 12/2/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/25/2020. Consent Form due by 11/10/2020. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/22/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Due to an unavoidable scheduling conflict, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference is hereby RESET for 12/3/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/25/2020. Consent Form due by 11/10/2020. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/22/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/9/2020. Due to an unavoidable scheduling conflict, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 2:30 PM is hereby RESET in time only to 01:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. Text Only Entry (nywlc1, )
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/24/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 11/10/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/17/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 11/24/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2840-NYW (angar, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carl Andrew Fitz on behalf of Marcus Morris Attorney Carl Andrew Fitz added to party Marcus Morris (pty:pla) (Fitz, Carl)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Marcus Morris Attorney Andrew W. Dunlap added to party Marcus Morris (pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MPC Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Platte River Inspection Services (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7496201)Attorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Marcus Morris (pty:pla), filed by Marcus Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Josephson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. MPC Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Morris
Represented By: Michael Andrew Josephson
Represented By: Carl Andrew Fitz
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Andrew Wells Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPC Holdings, Inc. d/b/a Platte River Inspection Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPC Holdings, Inc. doing business as Platte River Inspection Services
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Schacht
Represented By: Paul M. Knettel
Represented By: Mark D. Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?