Edwards v. Edwards
Petitioner: Barbara J. Edwards and Barbara Jo Edwards
Respondent: Mark Edwards
Case Number: 1:2020cv02843
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE of Service by E-mail by Clerk of Court re #27 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, Jefferson County District Court, Case 2018DR30269 to diana.coffey@judicial.state.co.us (evana, )
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #6 Petitioner Barbara Jo Edwards' Motion to Remand and for Award of Fees and Costs Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c), and Request for Expedited or Forthwith Relief ("Motion to Remand"). This case is hereby REMANDED to the Jefferson County District Court; Petitioner is entitled to reasonable attorneys' fees and costs incurred as a result of removal of this action under 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Petitioner must file a separate Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs within 30 days of entry of this Order in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 54; Respondents Motion for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal (Doc. #18 ) is DENIED because the jurisdictional issues identified herein are unresolvable and, thus, amendment of the Notice of Removal would be futile; the Court retains jurisdiction for the sole purpose of determining the reasonableness of Petitioner's request for attorneys' fees, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/3/2020.(evana, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Petitioner Barbara Jo Edwards. (Biscan, Matthew)
October 26, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #18 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal filed by Respondent Mark Edwards. (Luther, Brian)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #23 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Opposition. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Amended Opposition to #6 Petitioner Barbara Jo Edwards' Motion to Remand and for Award of Fees and Costs (attached as Exhibit [23-1] is accepted for filing and shall be filed by the Clerk's Office as a separate document. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/26/2020. Text Only Entry(cmasec)
October 23, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Opposition to #6 Motion to Remand by Respondent Mark Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A , #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) )(Luther, Brian)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER STRIKING #21 Defendant's Response to #6 Petitioner's Motion to Remand and for Award of Fees and Costs for failure to comply with CMA Civ. Practice Standard 10.1(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1(e). SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/22/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
October 21, 2020 Filing 21 STRICKEN by Doc. #22 RESPONSE to #6 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Respondent Mark Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A , #2 Exhibit B , #3 Exhibit C , #4 Exhibit D , #5 Exhibit E )(Luther, Brian) Modified on 10/22/2020 (cmasec).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge Crews is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 10/13/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
October 12, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #18 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal In Opposition filed by Petitioner Barbara Jo Edwards. (Biscan, Matthew)
October 12, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal by Respondent Mark Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) , #2 Proposed Amended Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A , #4 Exhibit B , #5 Exhibit C , #6 Exhibit D , #7 Exhibit E , #8 Exhibit F , #9 Exhibit G )(Luther, Brian)
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Court's Order of September 30 2020 by Respondent Mark Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Luther, Brian)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge Christine M. Arguello for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2843-CMA (angar, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02843-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Respondent Mark Edwards All parties do not consent.. (Luther, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant To C.R.C.P. Rule 37 by Respondent Mark Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Response To Petitioner's Motion for Sanctions)(Luther, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION to Strike Petitioner's Notice To Take Deposition by Respondent Mark Edwards. (Luther, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 First MOTION to Strike Subpoena Duces Tecum by Respondent Mark Edwards. (Luther, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION to Quash Service of Petitioner's Second Motion Motion To Compel And Request For Sanctions Pursuant To C.R.C.P. Rule 37 by Respondent Mark Edwards. (Luther, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Second MOTION for Contempt Petitioner's Second Verified Motion for Issuance Of Contempt Citation by Respondent Mark Edwards. (Luther, Brian)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Register of Actions - Edwards v. Edwards case # 2018DR030269 by Respondent Mark Edwards (Luther, Brian)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendant husband removed this case from state district court requesting relief from an upcoming contempt hearing. Defendant alleges a due process violation by the state court judge as the reason for this removal to federal court. However in the reviewing the matter, the Court finds Defendant is seeking the equivalent of an interlocutory appeal of a state court action. The Court is unaware, and Defendant has failed to provide, any authority allowing such recovery. Accordingly, the Defendant is ORDERED to show cause for why this Court should not summarily remand the case back to state district court. Defendant's Show Cause Response is due 10-9-2020. Further, the Magistrate Judge Consent Form #5 is due by 10-7-2020. Defendant's counsel is ORDERED to confer with Plaintiff's counsel on whether the Parties consent to jurisdiction by magistrate judge. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 09-30-2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
September 30, 2020 Filing 6 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Petitioner Barbara Jo Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit 2 to Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 3 to Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit 4 to Motion to Remand, #5 Proposed Order (PDF Only) to Motion to Remanad)(Biscan, Matthew)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number COX096477 (cpomm, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED (cpomm, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE by Respondent Mark Edwards (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Cover Sheet)(Luther, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Barbara J. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Barbara Jo Edwards
Represented By: Matthew Yager Biscan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mark Edwards
Represented By: Brian R. Luther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?