Maltby v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Paula Maltby
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02858
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11/19/2020. (slibi, )
November 19, 2020 Filing 12 COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/19/2020. Discovery due by 5/21/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/2/2021. Proposed Protective Orders due 12/3/2020. Joint Status Report due by 3/16/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. FTR: Courtroom C203. (slibi, )
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Paula Maltby. (Quisenberry, Andrew)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/9/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
November 4, 2020 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02858-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
November 4, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Paula Maltby All parties do not consent.. (Quisenberry, Andrew)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Paula Maltby. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020. (Quisenberry, Andrew)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jeffrey H. McClelland on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Jeffrey H. McClelland added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (McClelland, Jeffrey)
October 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Michael Kratz on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Timothy Michael Kratz added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Kratz, Timothy)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 22 September 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before November 5, 2020, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form.Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/12/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2020 02:30 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter.The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The partiesare directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7498835)Attorney Andrew Curry Quisenberry added to party Paula Maltby(pty:pla), filed by Paula Maltby. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Quisenberry, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maltby v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey H. McClelland
Represented By: Timothy Michael Kratz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Maltby
Represented By: Andrew Curry Quisenberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?