Geographic Location Innovations LLC v. Anatomie Corporation
Plaintiff: Geographic Location Innovations LLC
Defendant: Anatomie Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv02871
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2020 Filing 13 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 12/21/2020. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
December 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Geographic Location Innovations LLC (Johnson, Jay)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court notes this Motion is stylized as a Motion to Stay, however, it is brought pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 6.1. As suh the Court construes this as a Motion for Extension of Time to File. Accordingly, the Court finds good cause to GRANT the Unopposed Motion. The Parties are ORDERED to submit dismissal paperwork by 12-10-2020, or, in the alternative, Defendant shall file its Answer by 12-10-2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11-12-2020. Text Only Entry(skclc2).
November 11, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Plaintiff Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Anatomie Corporation's answer is due 11/16/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 10-19-2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2).
October 19, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
October 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. Anatomie Corporation served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Johnson, Jay)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jsalz, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jsalz, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Anatomie Corporation re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original Complaint against Anatomie Corporation (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7500261)Attorney Jay B. Johnson added to party Geographic Location Innovations LLC(pty:pla), filed by Geographic Location Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Johnson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geographic Location Innovations LLC v. Anatomie Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geographic Location Innovations LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anatomie Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?