Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Defendant: Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02878
Filed: September 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404 by Defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew T. Jones, #2 Declaration of Raghu Rao)(Jones, Andrew)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 30 October 2020. For good cause shown, the parties' "Joint Motion to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference" #14 is granted as follows. The Scheduling Conference set for November 19, 2020 is vacated and rescheduled to February 8, 2021, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/1/2021. (cmadr, )
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #14 Joint MOTION to Continue filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/29/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
October 29, 2020 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Continue by Plaintiff Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jay)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before November 30, 2020. Answer due 11/30/2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 10/19/2020. Text Only Entry(dddlc3, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Zoom Video Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Saulsbury, Timothy)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew T. Jones on behalf of Zoom Video Communications, Inc.Attorney Andrew T. Jones added to party Zoom Video Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Jones, Andrew)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy C. Saulsbury on behalf of Zoom Video Communications, Inc.Attorney Timothy C. Saulsbury added to party Zoom Video Communications, Inc.(pty:dft) (Saulsbury, Timothy)
October 12, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. Zoom Video Communications, Inc. served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Johnson, Jay)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 23 September 2020. This Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on November 19, 2020, at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom A-501, on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse located at 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado.Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/12/2020. (cmadr, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/23/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 Report re Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (jtorr, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
September 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Zoom Video Communications, Inc. by Plaintiff Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
September 22, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Patent Asset Management, LLC for Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
September 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original Complaint against Zoom Video Communications, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7501246)Attorney Jay B. Johnson added to party Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC (pty:pla), filed by Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC v. Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoom Video Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew T. Jones
Represented By: Timothy C. Saulsbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rothschild Broadcast Distribution Systems, LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?